US HB2611 | 2009-2010 | 111th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on January 21 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-01-21 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 21 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-01-21 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Amends the Homeland Security Act of 2002 to authorize appropriations to the Director of the Domestic Nuclear Detection Office of the Department of Homeland Security (DHS) for the Securing the Cities Initiative, including funding for: (1) each city in which the Initiative has been implemented by FY2009; and (2) additional Securing the Cities initiatives to be implemented in not fewer than two sites participating in the Urban Area Security Initiative.
Title
To amend the Homeland Security Act of 2002 to authorize the Securing the Cities Initiative of the Department of Homeland Security, and for other purposes.
Sponsors
Rep. Yvette Clarke [D-NY] | Rep. Steve Israel [D-NY] | Rep. Peter King [R-NY] | Rep. Nita Lowey [D-NY] |
Rep. Laura Richardson [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-01-21 | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. | |
2010-01-20 | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. | |
2010-01-20 | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H225) | |
2010-01-20 | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2611. | |
2010-01-20 | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H225-226) | |
2010-01-20 | Ms. Clarke moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. | |
2010-01-12 | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 226. | |
2010-01-12 | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Homeland Security. H. Rept. 111-389. | |
2009-11-17 | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. | |
2009-11-17 | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. | |
2009-11-17 | Subcommittee on Emerging Threats, Cybersecurity, and Science and Technology Discharged. | |
2009-06-17 | Referred to the Subcommittee on Emerging Threats, Cybersecurity, and Science and Technology. | |
2009-05-21 | Referred to the House Committee on Homeland Security. |
Same As/Similar To
SB3312 (Related) 2010-05-05 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Subjects
Department of Homeland Security
Emergency management
Homeland security
Nuclear weapons
Radioactive wastes and releases
Terrorism
Urban and suburban affairs and development
Emergency management
Homeland security
Nuclear weapons
Radioactive wastes and releases
Terrorism
Urban and suburban affairs and development