US HB2606 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Enrolled on December 21 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-31 - Signed by President.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on December 21 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-31 - Signed by President.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Stigler Act Amendments of 2018 This bill amends the Act of August 4, 1947 (commonly known as the Stigler Act) to revise the qualifications that must be met by a person who inherits land originally allotted to members of the Five Civilized Tribes of Oklahoma (the Choctaw, Chickasaw, Creek, Cherokee, and Seminole tribes) for that land to remain in restricted status. When land is in restricted status, it is not subject to taxation and may not be sold or transferred without permission of the Department of the Interior. Under current law, the restricted fee status of land allotted to the Five Tribes is maintained only if the individual holding title has at least 50% Indian blood from one of the Five Tribes. This bill removes this requirement. Thus, the restricted fee status is maintained for all lineal descendants of an original enrollee whose name appears on the membership rolls of the Five Tribes.
Title
Stigler Act Amendments of 2018
Sponsors
Rep. Tom Cole [R-OK] | Sen. Markwayne Mullin [R-OK] | Rep. Frank Lucas [R-OK] | Rep. Steve Russell [R-OK] |
Roll Calls
2018-12-20 - House - On motion that the House suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendments RC# 471 (Y: 399 N: 0 NV: 33 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-31 | Senate | Signed by President. |
2018-12-21 | Senate | Presented to President. |
2018-12-20 | Senate | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2018-12-20 | Senate | On motion that the House suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendments Agreed to by recorded vote (2/3 required): 399 - 0 (Roll no. 471). (consideration: CR H10484-10485) |
2018-12-19 | Senate | At the conclusion of debate, the chair put the question on the motion to suspend the rules. Mr. McClintock objected to the vote on the grounds that a quorum was not present. Further proceedings on the motion were postponed. The point of no quorum was considered as withdrawn. |
2018-12-19 | Senate | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on the motion to suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendments to H.R. 2606. |
2018-12-19 | Senate | Mr. McClintock moved that the House suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendments. (consideration: CR H10303-10305; text: CR H10303) |
2018-12-17 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2018-12-13 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendments by Unanimous Consent. |
2018-12-13 | Senate | S.Amdt.4110 Amendment SA 4110 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent. |
2018-12-13 | Senate | S.Amdt.4110 Amendment SA 4110 proposed by Senator Lankford. (consideration: CR S7576; text: CR S7576) To clarify certain provisions. |
2018-12-13 | Senate | Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S7576) |
2018-11-29 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 698. |
2018-11-29 | Senate | Committee on Indian Affairs. Reported by Senator Hoeven without amendment. With written report No. 115-398. |
2018-11-28 | Senate | Committee on Indian Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2018-11-14 | Senate | Committee on Indian Affairs. Hearings held. |
2018-09-17 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Indian Affairs. |
2018-09-12 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2018-09-12 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H8134-8135) |
2018-09-12 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2606. |
2018-09-12 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8134-8136) |
2018-09-12 | House | Mr. Gianforte moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2018-08-21 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 698. |
2018-08-21 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 115-902. |
2018-06-13 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2018-06-13 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2018-06-13 | House | Subcommittee on Indian, Insular and Alaska Native Affairs Discharged. |
2017-10-04 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2017-06-07 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Indian, Insular and Alaska Native Affairs. |
2017-05-23 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2017-05-23 | House | Introduced in House |