US HB2582 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on October 3 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-07-31 - By Senator Murkowski from Committee on Energy and Natural Resources filed written report. Report No. 115-312.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on October 3 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-07-31 - By Senator Murkowski from Committee on Energy and Natural Resources filed written report. Report No. 115-312.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Confirming State Land Grants for Education Act (Sec. 2) This bill allows the state of Utah, subject to valid existing rights, to select certain lands under the administrative jurisdiction of the Bureau of Land Management (BLM) of the Department of the Interior that are identified as available for disposal by land exchange in the Record of Decision for the Pony Express Resource Management Plan and Rangeland Program Summary for Utah County in fulfillment of certain land grants made to Utah upon being admitted as a state to further the purposes of the State of Utah School and Institutional Trust Lands Administration, without further land use planning action by the BLM. The criteria listed in Decision 3 of the Lands Program of the resource management plan shall not apply to any lands selected by Utah pursuant to this bill.
Title
Confirming State Land Grants for Education Act
Sponsors
Rep. Mia Love [R-UT] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-31 | Senate | By Senator Murkowski from Committee on Energy and Natural Resources filed written report. Report No. 115-312. |
2018-07-30 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 540. |
2018-07-30 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Murkowski without amendment. Without written report. |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Public Lands, Forests, and Mining. Hearings held. |
2017-10-03 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. |
2017-10-02 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2017-10-02 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H7644) |
2017-10-02 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2582. |
2017-10-02 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7643-7644) |
2017-10-02 | House | Mr. Thompson (PA) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2017-09-12 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 218. |
2017-09-12 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 115-305. |
2017-07-26 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent. |
2017-07-26 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2017-07-14 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2017-06-07 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands. |
2017-05-22 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2017-05-22 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1665 (Related) 2018-02-07 - Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Public Lands, Forests, and Mining. Hearings held.
Subjects
Elementary and secondary education
Land transfers
Land use and conservation
Public lands and natural resources
Utah
Land transfers
Land use and conservation
Public lands and natural resources
Utah