US HB2575 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on September 15 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-15 - Received in the Senate. Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 531.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on September 15 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-15 - Received in the Senate. Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 531.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes the AI Center of Excellence within the General Services Administration to advise and promote the efforts of the federal government in developing innovative uses of artificial intelligence (AI) to benefit the public, and improve cohesion and competency in the use of AI. The Office of Management and Budget must issue a memorandum to federal agencies regarding AI governance approaches, to be followed by preparation and submission of governance plans by the agencies. In addition, the Office of Personnel Management must identify key skills and competencies needed for positions related to AI; and establish an occupational series, or revise an existing job series, to include positions the primary duties of which relate to AI.
Title
AI in Government Act of 2020
Sponsors
Rep. Jerry McNerney [D-CA] | Rep. Mark Meadows [R-NC] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-15 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 531. |
2020-09-14 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2020-09-14 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H4354-4355) |
2020-09-14 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2575. |
2020-09-14 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H4354-4356) |
2020-09-14 | House | Mrs. Maloney, Carolyn B. moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2019-12-19 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-05-08 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform. |
2019-05-08 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1363 (Same As) 2020-06-01 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 456.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Advanced technology and technological innovations
Advisory bodies
Computers and information technology
Congressional oversight
Employment and training programs
Executive agency funding and structure
General Services Administration
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government information and archives
Government operations and politics
Public-private cooperation
Advanced technology and technological innovations
Advisory bodies
Computers and information technology
Congressional oversight
Employment and training programs
Executive agency funding and structure
General Services Administration
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government information and archives
Government operations and politics
Public-private cooperation