US SB1363 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Introduced on May 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-01 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 456.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-01 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 456.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes the AI Center of Excellence within the General Services Administration to advise and promote the efforts of the federal government in developing innovative uses of artificial intelligence (AI) to benefit the public, and improve cohesion and competency in the use of AI. The Office of Management and Budget must issue a memorandum to federal agencies regarding AI governance approaches, to be followed by preparation and submission of governance plans by the agencies. In addition, the Office of Personnel Management must identify key skills and competencies needed for positions related to AI; and establish an occupational series, or revise an existing job series, to include positions the primary duties of which relate to AI.
Title
AI in Government Act of 2019
Sponsors
Sen. Brian Schatz [D-HI] | Sen. Cory Gardner [R-CO] | Sen. Rob Portman [R-OH] | Sen. Kamala Harris [D-CA] |
Sen. Gary Peters [D-MI] | Sen. Amy Klobuchar [D-MN] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-01 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 456. |
2020-06-01 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Johnson with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 116-225. |
2019-11-06 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2575 (Same As) 2020-09-15 - Received in the Senate. Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 531.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Advanced technology and technological innovations
Advisory bodies
Computers and information technology
Congressional oversight
Employment and training programs
Executive agency funding and structure
General Services Administration
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government information and archives
Government operations and politics
Public-private cooperation
Advanced technology and technological innovations
Advisory bodies
Computers and information technology
Congressional oversight
Employment and training programs
Executive agency funding and structure
General Services Administration
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government information and archives
Government operations and politics
Public-private cooperation