US HB2569 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on May 19 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-02 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 19 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-02 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Transparency in All Health Care Pricing Act of 2017 This bill requires entities that offer or furnish health care related products or services to the public, including health insurers and government agencies, to disclose the price for those products and services at the point of purchase and on the Internet. The entities must disclose all prices, including wholesale, retail, and discounted prices, that are accepted as payment in full for products and services furnished to individual consumers. The Department of Health and Human Services may investigate and impose civil penalties on entities that fail to comply with this requirement.
Title
Transparency in All Health Care Pricing Act of 2017
Sponsors
Rep. Ed Perlmutter [D-CO] | Rep. Mike Gallagher [R-WI] | Rep. Norma Torres [D-CA] | Rep. Mark Sanford [R-SC] |
Rep. Raja Krishnamoorthi [D-IL] | Rep. Ron DeSantis [R-FL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-02 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2017-05-26 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2017-05-19 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, and Oversight and Government Reform, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-05-19 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, and Oversight and Government Reform, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-05-19 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, and Oversight and Government Reform, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-05-19 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, and Oversight and Government Reform, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-05-19 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB4808 (Related) 2018-01-19 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Subjects
Child health
Civil actions and liability
Consumer affairs
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government studies and investigations
Health
Health care costs and insurance
Health personnel
Health technology, devices, supplies
Inflation and prices
Medicaid
Medicare
Poverty and welfare assistance
Retail and wholesale trades
Civil actions and liability
Consumer affairs
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government studies and investigations
Health
Health care costs and insurance
Health personnel
Health technology, devices, supplies
Inflation and prices
Medicaid
Medicare
Poverty and welfare assistance
Retail and wholesale trades
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-bill/2569/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hr2569/BILLS-115hr2569ih.pdf |