US HB2522 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-31 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-31 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies requirements relating to the detention of alien children and families, asylum seekers, and other immigration-related provisions. The Department of Homeland Security (DHS) shall house detained alien children with a parent during the pendency of any civil or criminal proceedings if the children are accompanied by a parent. DHS shall ensure the facilities meet various standards, including those relating to accommodations and medical treatment. DHS shall expedite removal proceedings against alien children convicted of certain crimes. The bill also imposes requirements on placing unaccompanied alien children with a nongovernmental sponsor, such as requiring the sponsor to be the child's parent or legal guardian and legally present in the United States. The Department of Health of Human Services may make exceptions in certain instances, such as when a child is believed to be a human trafficking victim, and place such a child with another relative. The bill requires asylum applicants to arrive in the United States only at a designated port of arrival, where current law allows aliens to seek asylum whether or not they arrive at a designated port. DHS shall establish at least four regional processing centers to house and process detained aliens. U.S. Customs and Border Protection and U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement shall increase staffing, including field operations officers, support personnel, and attorneys. Aliens who overstay a nonimmigrant visa or under a visa waiver program more than 30 days shall be subject to detention and removal, and barred from obtaining various immigration benefits.
Title
HUMANE Act of 2019 Humanitarian Upgrades to Manage and Assist our Nation's Enforcement Act of 2019
Sponsors
Rep. Henry Cuellar [D-TX] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-31 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship. |
2019-05-13 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Border Security, Facilitation, and Operations. |
2019-05-06 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management. |
2019-05-03 | House | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Foreign Affairs, Homeland Security, Ways and Means, Agriculture, and Transportation and Infrastructure, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-05-03 | House | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Foreign Affairs, Homeland Security, Ways and Means, Agriculture, and Transportation and Infrastructure, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-05-03 | House | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Foreign Affairs, Homeland Security, Ways and Means, Agriculture, and Transportation and Infrastructure, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-05-03 | House | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Foreign Affairs, Homeland Security, Ways and Means, Agriculture, and Transportation and Infrastructure, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-05-03 | House | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Foreign Affairs, Homeland Security, Ways and Means, Agriculture, and Transportation and Infrastructure, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-05-03 | House | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Foreign Affairs, Homeland Security, Ways and Means, Agriculture, and Transportation and Infrastructure, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-05-03 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1303 (Same As) 2019-05-02 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S2616-2617)
Subjects
Administrative remedies
Advanced technology and technological innovations
Assault and harassment offenses
Border security and unlawful immigration
Building construction
Child health
Child safety and welfare
Civil actions and liability
Congressional oversight
Crime victims
Crimes against children
Crimes against women
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Criminal justice information and records
Customs enforcement
Department of Homeland Security
Detention of persons
Disability and paralysis
Domestic violence and child abuse
Employee hiring
Executive agency funding and structure
Family relationships
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
Genetics
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government ethics and transparency, public corruption
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Guatemala
Health personnel
Human trafficking
Immigrant health and welfare
Immigration
Immigration status and procedures
Intergovernmental relations
Judges
Judicial procedure and administration
Judicial review and appeals
Juvenile crime and gang violence
Latin America
Law enforcement officers
Lawyers and legal services
Mental health
Mexico
Photography and imaging
Public contracts and procurement
Refugees, asylum, displaced persons
Separation, divorce, custody, support
Sex offenses
State and local government operations
Violent crime
Visas and passports
Advanced technology and technological innovations
Assault and harassment offenses
Border security and unlawful immigration
Building construction
Child health
Child safety and welfare
Civil actions and liability
Congressional oversight
Crime victims
Crimes against children
Crimes against women
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Criminal justice information and records
Customs enforcement
Department of Homeland Security
Detention of persons
Disability and paralysis
Domestic violence and child abuse
Employee hiring
Executive agency funding and structure
Family relationships
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
Genetics
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government ethics and transparency, public corruption
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Guatemala
Health personnel
Human trafficking
Immigrant health and welfare
Immigration
Immigration status and procedures
Intergovernmental relations
Judges
Judicial procedure and administration
Judicial review and appeals
Juvenile crime and gang violence
Latin America
Law enforcement officers
Lawyers and legal services
Mental health
Mexico
Photography and imaging
Public contracts and procurement
Refugees, asylum, displaced persons
Separation, divorce, custody, support
Sex offenses
State and local government operations
Violent crime
Visas and passports
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/2522/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr2522/BILLS-116hr2522ih.pdf |