US HB250 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-01-13 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Courts, Intellectual Property, and the Internet.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Courts, Intellectual Property, And The Internet Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-01-13 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Courts, Intellectual Property, and the Internet.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Courts, Intellectual Property, And The Internet Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Judicial Administration and Improvement Act of 2016 This bill divides the U.S. Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit into: (1) a new Ninth Circuit, to be composed of California, Hawaii, Oregon, Washington, Guam, and the Northern Mariana Islands; and (2) a newly established Twelfth Circuit, to be composed of Alaska, Arizona, Idaho, Montana, and Nevada. The bill designates locations where the new circuits are to hold regular sessions. The bill distributes active circuit judges of the former Ninth Circuit to the new circuits. Circuit judges and senior circuit judges currently stationed in Alaska, Arizona, Idaho, Montana, or Nevada may elect their circuit assignment. For each circuit judge in regular service who elects to be assigned to the new Ninth Circuit, the President shall appoint one additional circuit judge for the Twelfth Circuit.
Title
Judicial Administration and Improvement Act of 2016
Sponsors
Rep. Andy Biggs [R-AZ] | Rep. Trent Franks [R-AZ] | Rep. David Schweikert [R-AZ] | Rep. Paul Gosar [R-AZ] |
Sen. Martha McSally [R-AZ] | Rep. Don Young [R-AK] | Rep. Jeff Duncan [R-SC] | Rep. Brian Babin [R-TX] |
Rep. Thomas Garrett [R-VA] | Rep. Lamar Smith [R-TX] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-13 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Courts, Intellectual Property, and the Internet. |
2017-01-04 | House | Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary. |
2017-01-04 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB196 (Related) 2017-01-13 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Courts, Intellectual Property, and the Internet.
HB1598 (Related) 2017-03-31 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Courts, Intellectual Property, and the Internet.
SB276 (Related) 2017-02-02 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S657)
SB295 (Related) 2017-02-02 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
HB1598 (Related) 2017-03-31 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Courts, Intellectual Property, and the Internet.
SB276 (Related) 2017-02-02 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S657)
SB295 (Related) 2017-02-02 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Subjects
Alaska
Arizona
California
Federal appellate courts
Guam
Hawaii
Idaho
Judges
Judicial procedure and administration
Law
Montana
Nevada
Northern Mariana Islands
Oregon
Washington State
Arizona
California
Federal appellate courts
Guam
Hawaii
Idaho
Judges
Judicial procedure and administration
Law
Montana
Nevada
Northern Mariana Islands
Oregon
Washington State
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-bill/250/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hr250/BILLS-115hr250ih.pdf |