US HB196 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-01-13 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Courts, Intellectual Property, and the Internet.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Courts, Intellectual Property, And The Internet Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-01-13 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Courts, Intellectual Property, and the Internet.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Courts, Intellectual Property, And The Internet Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals Judgeship and Reorganization Act of 2017 This bill divides the U.S. Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit into: (1) the Ninth Circuit, composed of California, Guam, Hawaii, and Northern Mariana Islands; and (2) the Twelfth Circuit, composed of Alaska, Arizona, Idaho, Montana, Nevada, Oregon, and Washington. The President must appoint two additional judges for the former Ninth Circuit, three judges for the new Ninth Circuit, and two additional temporary judges for the former Ninth Circuit. The bill: (1) specifies the locations where new circuits are to hold regular sessions, (2) distributes active circuit judges of the former Ninth Circuit to the new circuits, (3) allows senior circuit judges of the former Ninth Circuit to elect assignment, and (4) authorizes administrative coordination between any two contiguous circuits.
Title
Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals Judgeship and Reorganization Act of 2017
Sponsors
Rep. Michael Simpson [R-ID] | Rep. Don Young [R-AK] | Rep. Greg Gianforte [R-MT] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-13 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Courts, Intellectual Property, and the Internet. |
2017-01-03 | House | Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary. |
2017-01-03 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB250 (Related) 2017-01-13 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Courts, Intellectual Property, and the Internet.
HB1598 (Related) 2017-03-31 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Courts, Intellectual Property, and the Internet.
SB276 (Related) 2017-02-02 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S657)
SB295 (Related) 2017-02-02 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
HB1598 (Related) 2017-03-31 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Courts, Intellectual Property, and the Internet.
SB276 (Related) 2017-02-02 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S657)
SB295 (Related) 2017-02-02 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Subjects
Alaska
Arizona
California
Federal appellate courts
Guam
Hawaii
Idaho
Judges
Judicial procedure and administration
Law
Montana
Nevada
Northern Mariana Islands
Oregon
Washington State
Arizona
California
Federal appellate courts
Guam
Hawaii
Idaho
Judges
Judicial procedure and administration
Law
Montana
Nevada
Northern Mariana Islands
Oregon
Washington State
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-bill/196/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hr196/BILLS-115hr196ih.pdf |