US HB2499 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on July 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-28 - Became Public Law No: 114-38. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on July 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-28 - Became Public Law No: 114-38. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Veterans Entrepreneurship Act of 2015 (Sec. 2) Amends the Small Business Act to prohibit the Small Business Administration (SBA) from collecting a guarantee fee in connection with a loan made under the SBA Express Program to a veteran or the spouse of a veteran on or after October 1, 2015, except during any upcoming fiscal year for which the President's budget, submitted to Congress, includes a cost for the Program that is above zero. (Sec. 3) Requires the SBA to assess for Congress the level of outreach to and consultation with female veterans regarding access to capital by women's business centers and Veterans Business Outreach Centers. (Sec. 4) Amends the Consolidated and Further Continuing Appropriations Act, 2015 to increase the limit from $18.75 billion to $23.5 billion for FY2015 commitments for general business loans for a combination of amortizing term loans and the aggregated maximum line of credit provided by revolving loans. Amends the Small Business Act to prohibit the SBA, starting October 1, 2015, from guaranteeing a loan if: the lender determines that the borrower is unable to obtain credit elsewhere solely because the lender's liquidity depends upon the guaranteed portion of the loan being sold on the secondary market, or the sole purpose for requesting the guarantee is to allow the lender to exceed its legal lending limit.
Title
Veterans Entrepreneurship Act of 2015
Sponsors
Rep. Steve Chabot [R-OH] | Rep. Richard Hanna [R-NY] | Rep. Mike Bost [R-IL] | Rep. Tom Rice [R-SC] |
Rep. Stephen Knight [R-CA] | Rep. Christopher Gibson [R-NY] | Rep. Carlos Curbelo [R-FL] |
Roll Calls
2015-07-13 - House - On Motion to Suspend the Rules and Pass, as Amended (Y: 410 N: 1 NV: 22 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-28 | Senate | Became Public Law No: 114-38. (TXT | PDF) |
2015-07-28 | Senate | Signed by President. |
2015-07-27 | Senate | Presented to President. |
2015-07-27 | Senate | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2015-07-27 | Senate | On motion that the House suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendment Agreed to by voice vote. (text as House agreed to Senate amendment: CR H5508) |
2015-07-27 | Senate | DEBATE - The House proceeded with 40 minutes of debate on the motion to suspend the rules and agree in the Senate amendment to H.R. 2499. |
2015-07-27 | Senate | Mr. Chabot moved that the House suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendment. (consideration: CR H5508-5510) |
2015-07-24 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2015-07-23 | Senate | Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. |
2015-07-23 | Senate | S.Amdt.2326 Amendment SA 2326 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent. |
2015-07-23 | Senate | S.Amdt.2326 Amendment SA 2326 proposed by Senator Sullivan for Senator Vitter. (consideration: CR S5558; text: CR S5558) |
2015-07-23 | Senate | Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S5558) |
2015-07-14 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 149. |
2015-07-13 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2015-07-13 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 410 - 1 (Roll no. 434). (text: CR H5101) |
2015-07-13 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H5104-5105) |
2015-07-13 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2015-07-13 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2499. |
2015-07-13 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5101-5102) |
2015-07-13 | House | Mr. Chabot moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2015-06-25 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 139. |
2015-06-25 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Small Business. H. Rept. 114-187. |
2015-06-10 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2015-06-10 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2015-05-21 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Small Business. |
2015-05-21 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB3191 (Related) 2015-07-23 - Referred to the House Committee on Small Business.
Subjects
Commerce
Congressional oversight
Credit and credit markets
Government lending and loan guarantees
Government studies and investigations
Small business
User charges and fees
Veterans' education, employment, rehabilitation
Veterans' loans, housing, homeless programs
Women in business
Congressional oversight
Credit and credit markets
Government lending and loan guarantees
Government studies and investigations
Small business
User charges and fees
Veterans' education, employment, rehabilitation
Veterans' loans, housing, homeless programs
Women in business