US HB2490 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on April 6 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-04-06 - Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
Pending: House Financial Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 6 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-04-06 - Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
Pending: House Financial Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend the Consumer Financial Protection Act of 2010 to provide for whistleblower incentives and protection, and for other purposes.
Title
CFPB Whistleblower Incentives and Protection Act
Sponsors
Rep. Tom Emmer [R-MN] | Rep. Byron Donalds [R-FL] | Rep. Blaine Luetkemeyer [R-MO] | Rep. Dan Meuser [R-PA] |
Rep. Bill Posey [R-FL] | Rep. William Timmons [R-SC] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-06 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services. |
2023-04-06 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB2465 (Related) 2023-04-03 - Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
SB1124 (Related) 2023-03-30 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
HB2798 (Related) 2023-12-04 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 241.
SB1124 (Related) 2023-03-30 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
HB2798 (Related) 2023-12-04 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 241.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/118th-congress/house-bill/2490/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/118/bills/hr2490/BILLS-118hr2490ih.pdf |