US SB1124 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Introduced on March 30 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-30 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
Pending: Senate Banking, Housing, And Urban Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 30 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-30 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
Pending: Senate Banking, Housing, And Urban Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to amend the Consumer Financial Protection Act of 2010 to provide for whistleblower incentives and protection.
Title
Financial Compensation for CFPB Whistleblowers Act
Sponsors
Sen. Catherine Cortez Masto [D-NV] | Sen. Sherrod Brown [D-OH] | Sen. Richard Blumenthal [D-CT] | Sen. Elizabeth Warren [D-MA] |
Sen. Tina Smith [D-MN] | Sen. Richard Durbin [D-IL] | Sen. Jeff Merkley [D-OR] | Sen. Bernard Sanders [I-VT] |
Sen. John Fetterman [D-PA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-30 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2490 (Related) 2023-04-06 - Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
HB2465 (Same As) 2023-04-03 - Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
HB2798 (Related) 2023-12-04 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 241.
HB2465 (Same As) 2023-04-03 - Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
HB2798 (Related) 2023-12-04 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 241.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/118th-congress/senate-bill/1124/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/118/bills/s1124/BILLS-118s1124is.pdf |