US HB2417 | 2011-2012 | 112th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 36-0)
Status: Introduced on July 6 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-07-12 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 6 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-07-12 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Better Use of Light Bulbs Act - Repeals provisions of the Energy Independence and Security Act of 2007 concerning lighting energy efficiency, including provisions amending the Energy Policy and Conservation Act (EPCA), that: (1) prescribe energy efficiency standards for general service incandescent lamps, rough service lamps, and other designated lamps; (2) direct the Secretary of Energy (DOE) to conduct and report to the Federal Trade Commission (FTC) on an annual assessment of the market for general service lamps and compact fluorescent lamps; (3) direct the Secretary to carry out a proactive national program of consumer awareness, information, and education about lamp labels and energy-efficient lighting choices; (4) prohibit a manufacturer, distributor, retailer, or private labeler from distributing in commerce specified adapters for incandescent lamps; (5) authorize the Secretary to carry out a lighting technology research and development program; and (6) set forth minimum energy efficiency standards for incandescent reflector lamps. Provides that EPCA shall be applied and administered as if such provisions had not been enacted. Provides that: (1) no federal, state, or local requirement or standard regarding energy efficient lighting shall be effective to the extent that the requirement or standard can be satisfied only by installing or using lamps containing mercury; and (2) no state or local regulation concerning the energy efficiency or energy use of medium screw base general service incandescent lamps shall be effective.
Title
Better Use of Light Bulbs Act
Sponsors
Rep. Joe Barton [R-TX] | Rep. Todd Akin [R-MO] | Rep. Diane Black [R-TN] | Sen. Marsha Blackburn [R-TN] |
Rep. Paul Broun [R-GA] | Rep. Michael Burgess [R-TX] | Sen. Shelley Capito [R-WV] | Rep. Scott DesJarlais [R-TN] |
Rep. John Duncan [R-TN] | Rep. Blake Farenthold [R-TX] | Rep. Stephen Fincher [R-TN] | Rep. Michael Fitzpatrick [R-PA] |
Rep. Charles Fleischmann [R-TN] | Rep. Bill Flores [R-TX] | Rep. Bob Goodlatte [R-VA] | Rep. Vicky Hartzler [R-MO] |
Rep. Wally Herger [R-CA] | Rep. Randy Hultgren [R-IL] | Rep. Robert Latta [R-OH] | Sen. Cynthia Lummis [R-WY] |
Rep. Connie Mack [R-FL] | Rep. Tom McClintock [R-CA] | Rep. Howard McKeon [R-CA] | Rep. David McKinley [R-WV] |
Rep. Jeff Miller [R-FL] | Rep. Sue Myrick [R-NC] | Rep. Ted Poe [R-TX] | Rep. David Roe [R-TN] |
Rep. Todd Rokita [R-IN] | Rep. Steve Scalise [R-LA] | Rep. James Sensenbrenner [R-WI] | Rep. Steve Stivers [R-OH] |
Rep. Michael Turner [R-OH] | Rep. Tim Walberg [R-MI] | Rep. Frank Wolf [R-VA] | Rep. Steve Womack [R-AR] |
Roll Calls
2011-07-12 - House - On Motion to Suspend the Rules and Pass (Y: 233 N: 193 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-07-12 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2011-07-12 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Failed by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 233 - 193, 1 Present (Roll no. 563). |
2011-07-12 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H4926) |
2011-07-11 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2011-07-11 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2417. |
2011-07-11 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H4822-4830; text of measure as introduced: CR H4822) |
2011-07-11 | House | Mr. Barton (TX) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2011-07-06 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Power. |
2011-07-06 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
Same As/Similar To
HB91 (Related) 2011-02-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Power.
SB395 (Related) 2011-03-10 - Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Hearings held.
SB395 (Related) 2011-03-10 - Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Hearings held.
Subjects
Alternative and renewable resources
Consumer affairs
Energy
Energy efficiency and conservation
Energy research
Federal preemption
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Hazardous wastes and toxic substances
Lighting and heating
Research administration and funding
Research and development
Technology transfer and commercialization
Consumer affairs
Energy
Energy efficiency and conservation
Energy research
Federal preemption
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Hazardous wastes and toxic substances
Lighting and heating
Research administration and funding
Research and development
Technology transfer and commercialization