US HB2336 | 2011-2012 | 112th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 6 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-06 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
Pending: Senate Energy And Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 6 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-06 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
Pending: Senate Energy And Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
York River Wild and Scenic River Study Act of 2012 - Amends the Wild and Scenic Rivers Act to designate a specified segment of the York River in Maine and all of its associated tributaries for potential addition to the National Wild and Scenic Rivers System. Requires the Secretary of the Interior to complete a study of, and submit a report to Congress on, the York River. Requires such study to: (1) determine the designation's effect on existing commercial and recreational activities, the construction and operation of energy production and transmission infrastructure, and the authority of state and local governments to manage those activities; and (2) identify all authorities that will authorize or require the Secretary to influence local land use decisions (such as zoning) or place restrictions on non-federal land if designated under this Act, all authorities that the Secretary may use to condemn property, and all private property located in the area studied pursuant to this Act.
Title
York River Wild and Scenic River Study Act of 2012
Sponsors
Rep. Chellie Pingree [D-ME] | Rep. Michael Michaud [D-ME] | Rep. Brad Sherman [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-06 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. |
2012-06-05 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2012-06-05 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H3442) |
2012-06-05 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2336. |
2012-06-05 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H3442-3443) |
2012-06-05 | House | Mr. Hastings (WA) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2012-01-18 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 251. |
2012-01-18 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 112-370. |
2011-11-17 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent. |
2011-11-17 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2011-11-17 | House | Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests and Public Lands Discharged. |
2011-09-15 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2011-07-05 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests and Public Lands. |
2011-06-23 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2011-06-23 | House | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H4474, E1175-1176) |
Subjects
Government studies and investigations
Maine
Public lands and natural resources
Wilderness and natural areas, wildlife refuges, wild rivers, habitats
Maine
Public lands and natural resources
Wilderness and natural areas, wildlife refuges, wild rivers, habitats