US HB2334 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 23-13)
Status: Passed on December 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-13 - Became Public Law No: 116-87. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 23-13)
Status: Passed on December 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-13 - Became Public Law No: 116-87. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Designates the community-based outpatient clinic of the Department of Veterans Affairs in Odessa, Texas, as the "Wilson and Young Medal of Honor VA Clinic."
Title
To designate the Department of Veterans Affairs community-based outpatient clinic in Odessa, Texas, as the "Wilson and Young Medal of Honor VA Clinic".
Sponsors
Rep. Michael Conaway [R-TX] | Rep. Dan Crenshaw [R-TX] | Rep. Louie Gohmert [R-TX] | Rep. Will Hurd [R-TX] |
Rep. Brian Babin [R-TX] | Rep. Randy Weber [R-TX] | Rep. Kevin Brady [R-TX] | Rep. Pete Olson [R-TX] |
Rep. John Carter [R-TX] | Rep. Michael Cloud [R-TX] | Rep. Michael McCaul [R-TX] | Rep. John Ratcliffe [R-TX] |
Rep. Mac Thornberry [R-TX] | Rep. Jody Arrington [R-TX] | Rep. Roger Williams [R-TX] | Rep. Ron Wright [R-TX] |
Rep. Nicholas Taylor [R-TX] | Rep. Filemon Vela [D-TX] | Rep. Marc Veasey [D-TX] | Rep. Vicente Gonzalez [D-TX] |
Rep. Henry Cuellar [D-TX] | Rep. Chip Roy [R-TX] | Rep. Sheila Jackson-Lee [D-TX] | Rep. Kay Granger [R-TX] |
Rep. Al Green [D-TX] | Rep. Bill Flores [R-TX] | Rep. Kenny Marchant [R-TX] | Rep. Colin Allred [D-TX] |
Rep. Lloyd Doggett [D-TX] | Rep. Joaquin Castro [D-TX] | Rep. Lance Gooden [R-TX] | Rep. Michael Burgess [R-TX] |
Rep. Sylvia Garcia [D-TX] | Rep. Veronica Escobar [D-TX] | Rep. Elizabeth Fletcher [D-TX] | Rep. Eddie Johnson [D-TX] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-13 | House | Became Public Law No: 116-87. (TXT | PDF) |
2019-12-13 | House | Signed by President. |
2019-12-04 | House | Presented to President. |
2019-11-25 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2019-11-21 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. |
2019-11-21 | Senate | Senate Committee on Veterans' Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6767) |
2019-10-16 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2019-10-15 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2019-10-15 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H8132) |
2019-10-15 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2334. |
2019-10-15 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8132-8135) |
2019-10-15 | House | Mr. Takano moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2019-05-02 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2019-04-18 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2019-04-18 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1635 (Same As) 2019-05-23 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Congressional tributes
Department of Veterans Affairs
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Health facilities and institutions
Home and outpatient care
Military personnel and dependents
Texas
Veterans' medical care
Congressional tributes
Department of Veterans Affairs
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Health facilities and institutions
Home and outpatient care
Military personnel and dependents
Texas
Veterans' medical care