US HB2325 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-7)
Status: Introduced on April 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-07-29 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-07-29 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To conserve global bear populations by prohibiting the importation, exportation, and interstate trade of bear viscera and items, products, or substances containing, or labeled or advertised as containing, bear viscera, and for other purposes.
Title
Bear Protection Act of 2021
Sponsors
Rep. Ted Lieu [D-CA] | Rep. Mike Thompson [D-CA] | Rep. Rodney Davis [R-IL] | Rep. Ann Kuster [D-NH] |
Rep. Glenn Thompson [R-PA] | Rep. Steve Cohen [D-TN] | Rep. Gerald Connolly [D-VA] | Rep. David Valadao [R-CA] |
Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA] | Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] | Rep. Guy Reschenthaler [R-PA] | Rep. Matthew Cartwright [D-PA] |
Rep. Elizabeth Fletcher [D-TX] | Rep. Earl Blumenauer [D-OR] | Rep. Eric Swalwell [D-CA] | Rep. Michael Doyle [D-PA] |
Rep. Barry Moore [R-AL] | Rep. Joseph Neguse [D-CO] | Rep. Nancy Mace [R-SC] | Rep. Christopher Pappas [D-NH] |
Rep. Andy Levin [D-MI] | Rep. Jimmy Panetta [D-CA] | Rep. Jared Huffman [D-CA] | Rep. Dean Phillips [D-MN] |
Rep. Suzan DelBene [D-WA] | Rep. Nanette Barragan [D-CA] | Rep. Andre Carson [D-IN] | Rep. Paul Tonko [D-NY] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-29 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2021-06-02 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife. |
2021-04-01 | House | Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committees on Foreign Affairs, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2021-04-01 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB3472 (Related) 2022-01-11 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-bill/2325/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hr2325/BILLS-117hr2325ih.pdf |