US HB2325 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-13 - Became Public Law No: 116-86. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-13 - Became Public Law No: 116-86. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Designates the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 100 Calle Alondra in San Juan, Puerto Rico, as the "65th Infantry Regiment Post Office Building."
Title
To designate the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 100 Calle Alondra in San Juan, Puerto Rico, as the "65th Infantry Regiment Post Office Building".
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-13 | House | Became Public Law No: 116-86. (TXT | PDF) |
2019-12-13 | House | Signed by President. |
2019-12-04 | House | Presented to President. |
2019-11-25 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2019-11-21 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6767) |
2019-11-07 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 301. |
2019-11-07 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Johnson without amendment. Without written report. |
2019-11-06 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2019-07-18 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
2019-07-17 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2019-07-17 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H5957) |
2019-07-17 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2325. |
2019-07-17 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5957-5958) |
2019-07-17 | House | Mr. Rouda moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2019-06-12 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent. |
2019-06-12 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-04-15 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform. |
2019-04-15 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Caribbean area
Congressional tributes
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Government operations and politics
Postal service
Puerto Rico
U.S. territories and protectorates
Veterans' organizations and recognition
Congressional tributes
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Government operations and politics
Postal service
Puerto Rico
U.S. territories and protectorates
Veterans' organizations and recognition