US HB2287 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 28-5-1)
Status: Introduced on May 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-12-12 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 678.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-12-12 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 678.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
National Credit Union Administration Budget Transparency Act (Sec. 2) This bill amends the Federal Credit Union Act to require the National Credit Union Administration Board, before the annual submission of its required detailed business-type budget, to: (1) print a draft of the budget in the Federal Register, (2) hold a public hearing to receive comments from the public on the draft, and (3) include in the required integral set of accounts statements in which the budget will address any of such comments.
Title
National Credit Union Administration Budget Transparency Act
Sponsors
Rep. Mick Mulvaney [R-SC] | Sen. Kyrsten Sinema [I-AZ] | Rep. Brad Sherman [D-CA] | Rep. Steve Stivers [R-OH] |
Rep. Bill Posey [R-FL] | Rep. Randy Neugebauer [R-TX] | Rep. Blaine Luetkemeyer [R-MO] | Rep. Michael Fitzpatrick [R-PA] |
Rep. Edward Royce [R-CA] | Rep. Robert Pittenger [R-NC] | Rep. Tom Emmer [R-MN] | Rep. Garland Barr [R-KY] |
Rep. David Scott [D-GA] | Rep. Cheri Bustos [D-IL] | Rep. Keith Rothfus [R-PA] | Rep. Steve Chabot [R-OH] |
Rep. David Rouzer [R-NC] | Rep. Walter Jones [R-NC] | Rep. Brad Ashford [D-NE] | Rep. Lynn Jenkins [R-KS] |
Rep. Dennis Ross [R-FL] | Rep. Scott Rigell [R-VA] | Rep. Bill Johnson [R-OH] | Rep. Stephen Fincher [R-TN] |
Rep. Randy Hultgren [R-IL] | Rep. Sam Graves [R-MO] | Rep. Roger Williams [R-TX] | Rep. Patrick McHenry [R-NC] |
Rep. Jeff Duncan [R-SC] | Rep. Richard Hudson [R-NC] | Rep. Mark Meadows [R-NC] | Rep. David McKinley [R-WV] |
Rep. Bobby Rush [D-IL] | Rep. Don Young [R-AK] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-12-12 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 678. |
2016-12-12 | House | Reported by the Committee on Financial Services. H. Rept. 114-868. |
2015-12-09 | House | Ordered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 40 - 16. |
2015-12-09 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2015-12-08 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2015-10-21 | House | Hearings Held by the Subcommittee on Financial Institutions and Consumer Credit Prior to Referral. |
2015-06-11 | House | Hearings Held by the Subcommittee on Financial Institutions and Consumer Credit Prior to Referral. |
2015-05-13 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services. |
2015-05-13 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB924 (Same As) 2015-04-14 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
Subjects
Executive agency funding and structure
Finance and financial sector
Government information and archives
National Credit Union Administration
Public participation and lobbying
Finance and financial sector
Government information and archives
National Credit Union Administration
Public participation and lobbying