US HB2271 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 64-10)
Status: Engrossed on September 22 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-09-22 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Pending: Senate Health, Education, Labor, And Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on September 22 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-09-22 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Pending: Senate Health, Education, Labor, And Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Directs the Department of Health and Human Services (HHS) to address sudden unexpected infant death and sudden unexpected death in childhood, including through grants and by improving the quality of data pertaining to such deaths. Specifically, HHS must award grants to national organizations, governmental health departments, and other entities to provide grief counseling and other support services to families that experienced the sudden unexpected death of an infant or child. Additionally, HHS shall (1) determine whether to update the forms used to submit data about sudden unexpected infant or child deaths to registries and other fatality case reporting systems, and (2) encourage the use of such forms to improve the quality of data in the systems. Furthermore, HHS may provide other support to these registries and systems and may award grants to states and tribes for (1) supporting fetal and infant mortality and child death review programs, (2) improving data collection related to sudden unexpected infant death and sudden unexpected death in childhood, (3) training those who perform death scene investigations of children and infants, and (4) other activities to reduce or prevent unexpected infant and child deaths.
Title
Scarlett's Sunshine on Sudden Unexpected Death Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-22 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. |
2020-09-21 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2020-09-21 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H4621) |
2020-09-21 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2271. |
2020-09-21 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H4620-4623) |
2020-09-21 | House | Mrs. Dingell moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2020-09-21 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 424. |
2020-09-21 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 116-524. |
2020-07-15 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2020-07-15 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2020-03-11 | House | Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended) by Voice Vote . |
2020-03-11 | House | Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2020-01-08 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2019-04-11 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2019-04-10 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2019-04-10 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1130 (Related) 2020-12-31 - Became Public Law No: 116-273.
Subjects
Child health
Congressional oversight
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Family services
Genetics
Government studies and investigations
Health
Health information and medical records
Health programs administration and funding
Health promotion and preventive care
Law enforcement administration and funding
Medical education
Medical research
Medical tests and diagnostic methods
Mental health
Product safety and quality
Congressional oversight
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Family services
Genetics
Government studies and investigations
Health
Health information and medical records
Health programs administration and funding
Health promotion and preventive care
Law enforcement administration and funding
Medical education
Medical research
Medical tests and diagnostic methods
Mental health
Product safety and quality