US HB2243 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Introduced on May 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-11-16 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 261.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-11-16 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 261.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Equity in Government Compensation Act of 2015 (Sec. 3) This bill requires the Director of the Federal Housing Finance Agency to: (1) suspend immediately the compensation packages approved for 2015 for the chief executive officers of the Federal National Mortgage Association (Fannie Mae) and the Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation (Freddie Mac) (government-sponsored enterprises or GSEs); and (2) establish, in lieu of such packages, the compensation and benefits for each such officer at the same level in effect as of January 1, 2015. Such compensation and benefits may not thereafter be increased. This requirement may not be construed to affect the applicability to the chief executive officer of each GSE of the prohibition against receiving bonuses during any period of conservatorship on or after April 4, 2012. (Sec. 4) Any executive officer affected by this Act shall not be considered a federal employee.
Title
Equity in Government Compensation Act of 2015
Sponsors
Rep. Edward Royce [R-CA] | Rep. Bruce Poliquin [R-ME] | Rep. Stevan Pearce [R-NM] | Rep. Mick Mulvaney [R-SC] |
Rep. Rod Blum [R-IA] | Rep. Robert Latta [R-OH] | Rep. Bill Posey [R-FL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-11-16 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 261. |
2015-11-16 | House | Committee on Oversight and Government discharged. |
2015-11-16 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Financial Services. H. Rept. 114-339, Part I. |
2015-07-29 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 57 - 1. |
2015-07-29 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2015-07-28 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2015-05-08 | House | Referred to House Oversight and Government Reform |
2015-05-08 | House | Referred to House Financial Services |
2015-05-08 | House | Referred to the Committee on Financial Services, and in addition to the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2015-05-08 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB2036 (Related) 2015-11-25 - Became Public Law No: 114-93. (TXT | PDF)
Subjects
Corporate finance and management
Government corporations and government-sponsored enterprises
Housing and community development
Housing finance and home ownership
Wages and earnings
Government corporations and government-sponsored enterprises
Housing and community development
Housing finance and home ownership
Wages and earnings