US HB2241 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-7)
Status: Engrossed on December 18 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-12-18 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
Pending: Senate Foreign Relations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on December 18 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-12-18 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
Pending: Senate Foreign Relations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Global Health Innovation Act of 2015 (Sec. 2) This bill directs the U.S. Agency for International Development (USAID) to report annually for four years to Congress regarding: the extent to which global health innovations include drugs, diagnostics, devices, vaccines, electronic and mobile health technologies, and related behavior change and service delivery innovations; how innovation has advanced USAID's commitments to achieving an HIV/AIDS-free generation, ending preventable child and maternal deaths, and protecting communities from infectious diseases; how goals are set for health product development in relation to USAID's health-related goals; how USAID is leveraging U.S. investments to achieve greater impact in health innovation, developing and introducing affordable global health products, and increasing health innovations in the development pipeline; how USAID is coordinating with other federal departments and agencies in support of global health product development; and how USAID is coordinating and aligning global health innovation activities between the Global Development Lab, the Center for Accelerating Innovation and Impact, and the Bureau for Global Health.
Title
Global Health Innovation Act of 2015
Sponsors
Rep. Albio Sires [D-NJ] | Rep. Mario Diaz-Balart [R-FL] | Rep. Ileana Ros-Lehtinen [R-FL] | Rep. Gregory Meeks [D-NY] |
Rep. Ander Crenshaw [R-FL] | Rep. Suzan DelBene [D-WA] | Rep. Al Green [D-TX] | Rep. Gerald Connolly [D-VA] |
Rep. Raul Grijalva [D-AZ] | Rep. Steve Stivers [R-OH] | Rep. Ted Lieu [D-CA] | Rep. Christopher Smith [R-NJ] |
Rep. Daniel Donovan [R-NY] | Rep. Eliot Engel [D-NY] | Rep. William Keating [D-MA] | Rep. Bill Pascrell [D-NJ] |
Rep. Brian Higgins [D-NY] | Rep. Grace Meng [D-NY] | Rep. Brad Sherman [D-CA] | Rep. David Cicilline [D-RI] |
Rep. David Reichert [R-WA] | Rep. Betty McCollum [D-MN] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-12-18 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. |
2015-12-18 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2015-12-18 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR 12/16/2015 H9348) |
2015-12-18 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H10696) |
2015-12-16 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the chair put the question on the motion to suspend the rules. Mr. Royce objected to the vote on the grounds that a quorum was not present. Further proceedings on the motion were postponed. The point of no quorum was considered as withdrawn. |
2015-12-16 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2241. |
2015-12-16 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H9348-9349; text of measure as introduced: CR H9348) |
2015-12-16 | House | Mr. Royce moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2015-11-05 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent. |
2015-11-05 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2015-05-05 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs. |
2015-05-05 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Child health
Congressional oversight
Drug therapy
Foreign aid and international relief
Health programs administration and funding
Health promotion and preventive care
Health technology, devices, supplies
HIV/AIDS
Immunology and vaccination
Infectious and parasitic diseases
International affairs
Medical tests and diagnostic methods
Product development and innovation
Public-private cooperation
U.S. Agency for International Development (USAID)
Women's health
World health
Congressional oversight
Drug therapy
Foreign aid and international relief
Health programs administration and funding
Health promotion and preventive care
Health technology, devices, supplies
HIV/AIDS
Immunology and vaccination
Infectious and parasitic diseases
International affairs
Medical tests and diagnostic methods
Product development and innovation
Public-private cooperation
U.S. Agency for International Development (USAID)
Women's health
World health