US HB2211 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-0)
Status: Engrossed on September 18 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-09-18 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Science, And Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on September 18 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-09-18 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Science, And Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the Consumer Product Safety Commission to revise the safety standards for freestanding clothing storage units such as a dressers, bureaus, or chests of drawers. Such standards must include specified testing related to tip overs and new warning requirements for all such products entering the U.S. market.
Title
STURDY Act Stop Tip-overs of Unstable, Risky Dressers on Youth Act
Sponsors
Rep. Janice Schakowsky [D-IL] | Rep. Jerry McNerney [D-CA] | Rep. Darren Soto [D-FL] | Rep. Bobby Rush [D-IL] |
Rep. Tom O'Halleran [D-AZ] | Rep. Tony Cardenas [D-CA] | Rep. Kathy Castor [D-FL] | Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] |
Rep. James McGovern [D-MA] | Rep. Robin Kelly [D-IL] | Rep. Richard Neal [D-MA] | Rep. Suzan DelBene [D-WA] |
Rep. Peter DeFazio [D-OR] | Rep. Stephanie Murphy [D-FL] | Rep. Kathleen Rice [D-NY] | Rep. Nanette Barragan [D-CA] |
Rep. Angela Craig [D-MN] | Rep. Julia Brownley [D-CA] | Rep. Diana DeGette [D-CO] | Rep. Steve Cohen [D-TN] |
Rep. Debbie Dingell [D-MI] | Rep. Lisa Rochester [D-DE] | Rep. Lauren Underwood [D-IL] | Rep. Zoe Lofgren [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-18 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. |
2019-09-17 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2019-09-17 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H7720) |
2019-09-17 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2211. |
2019-09-17 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7720-7723) |
2019-09-17 | House | Ms. Schakowsky moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2019-09-16 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 166. |
2019-09-16 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 116-209. |
2019-07-17 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2019-07-17 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-07-10 | House | Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended) by Voice Vote . |
2019-07-10 | House | Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-06-13 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2019-04-11 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Consumer Protection and Commerce. |
2019-04-10 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2019-04-10 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1902 (Same As) 2019-06-19 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Child safety and welfare
Commerce
Consumer Product Safety Commission
Product safety and quality
Child safety and welfare
Commerce
Consumer Product Safety Commission
Product safety and quality