US HB2210 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum:
Status: Introduced on May 23 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-07-18 - Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended) by Voice Vote .
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 23 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-07-18 - Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended) by Voice Vote .
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Marine Gunnery Sergeant John David Fry Scholarship Improvements Act of 2013 - Expands the eligibility of children for educational assistance under the Department of Veterans Affairs (VA) post-9/11 educational assistance program to include the child of a person who, on or after September 11, 2001, is awarded the Purple Heart for an injury and dies as a result of that injury within 60 days after discharge or release from active-duty service.
Title
Marine Gunnery Sergeant John David Fry Scholarship Improvements Act of 2013
Sponsors
Rep. C.W. Young [R-FL] | Sen. Kyrsten Sinema [I-AZ] | Rep. Dina Titus [D-NV] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-18 | House | Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended) by Voice Vote . |
2013-07-18 | House | Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2013-06-26 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2013-06-11 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity. |
2013-05-23 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Family relationships
Higher education
Military personnel and dependents
Student aid and college costs
Veterans' education, employment, rehabilitation
Family relationships
Higher education
Military personnel and dependents
Student aid and college costs
Veterans' education, employment, rehabilitation
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/113th-congress/house-bill/2210/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/113/bills/hr2210/BILLS-113hr2210ih.pdf |