US HB2205 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 26-16)
Status: Introduced on May 1 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-12-12 - Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Financial Services. H. Rept. 114-867, Part I.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 1 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-12-12 - Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Financial Services. H. Rept. 114-867, Part I.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Data Security Act of 2015 Requires individuals, corporations, or other non-government entities that access, maintain, communicate, or handle sensitive financial account information or nonpublic personal information to implement an information security program and to notify consumers, federal law enforcement, appropriate administrative agencies, payment card networks, and consumer reporting agencies of certain data breaches of unencrypted sensitive information likely to cause identity theft or fraudulent transactions on consumer financial accounts. Directs entities to require their third-party service providers by contract to implement appropriate safeguards for sensitive information. Allows an entity to delay notifications upon the request of a law enforcement agency. Provides special notification procedures for: (1) third-party service providers that maintain data in electronic form on behalf of another entity, and (2) certain electronic data carriers. Allows financial institutions to communicate with account holders regarding breaches at third-party entities with access to their account information. Sets forth alternative compliance procedures for: (1) financial institutions and affiliates under the Gramm-Leach-Bliley Act, and (2) entities complying with certain health record privacy laws. Requires this Act to be enforced by the Federal Trade Commission, the Comptroller of the Currency, the Federal Reserve System, the Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation, the National Credit Union Administration Board, the Securities and Exchange Commission, the Commodity Futures Trading Commission, the Office of Federal Housing Enterprise Oversight, or a state insurance authority depending on the type of entity handling the sensitive information. Prohibits certain state laws from being imposed for information security and breach notification purposes. Sets forth requirements concerning the application of this Act to entities regulated by the Federal Communications Commission.
Title
Data Security Act of 2015
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-12-12 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Financial Services. H. Rept. 114-867, Part I. |
2015-12-09 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 46 - 9. |
2015-12-09 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2015-12-08 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2015-05-08 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Commerce, Manufacturing, and Trade. |
2015-05-01 | House | Referred to House Financial Services |
2015-05-01 | House | Referred to House Energy and Commerce |
2015-05-01 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Financial Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2015-05-01 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB961 (Related) 2015-04-15 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Bank accounts, deposits, capital
Banking and financial institutions regulation
Commodity Futures Trading Commission
Computer security and identity theft
Consumer credit
Department of the Treasury
Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation (FDIC)
Federal preemption
Federal Reserve System
Federal Trade Commission (FTC)
Finance and financial sector
Government information and archives
Health information and medical records
Insurance industry and regulation
National Credit Union Administration
Right of privacy
Securities and Exchange Commission (SEC)
Bank accounts, deposits, capital
Banking and financial institutions regulation
Commodity Futures Trading Commission
Computer security and identity theft
Consumer credit
Department of the Treasury
Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation (FDIC)
Federal preemption
Federal Reserve System
Federal Trade Commission (FTC)
Finance and financial sector
Government information and archives
Health information and medical records
Insurance industry and regulation
National Credit Union Administration
Right of privacy
Securities and Exchange Commission (SEC)
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/114th-congress/house-bill/2205/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/114/bills/hr2205/BILLS-114hr2205ih.pdf |