US HB2197 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-07-23 - Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks. Hearings held.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-07-23 - Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks. Hearings held.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
York River Wild and Scenic River Study Act of 2014 - Amends the Wild and Scenic Rivers Act to designate a specified segment of the York River in Maine and all of its associated tributaries for potential addition to the National Wild and Scenic Rivers System. Requires the Secretary of the Interior to study the York River to: (1) determine the designation's effect on existing commercial and recreational activities, the construction and operation of energy production and transmission infrastructure, and the authority of state and local governments to manage those activities; and (2) identify all authorities that will authorize or require the Secretary to influence local land use decisions (such as zoning) or place restrictions on non-federal land if designated under this Act, all authorities that the Secretary may use to condemn property, and all private property located in the area studied pursuant to this Act.
Title
York River Wild and Scenic River Study Act of 2014
Sponsors
Rep. Chellie Pingree [D-ME] | Rep. Michael Michaud [D-ME] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-23 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks. Hearings held. |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. |
2014-03-04 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H2139) |
2014-03-04 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2197. |
2014-03-04 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H2139-2141) |
2014-03-04 | House | Mr. Hastings (WA) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2013-09-20 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 163. |
2013-09-20 | House | Reported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 113-223. |
2013-07-24 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent. |
2013-07-24 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2013-07-24 | House | Subcommittee on Public Lands and Environmental Regulation Discharged. |
2013-06-04 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Public Lands and Environmental Regulation. |
2013-05-23 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1520 (Related) 2014-07-23 - Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks. Hearings held.
Subjects
Electric power generation and transmission
Government studies and investigations
Hunting and fishing
Land use and conservation
Maine
Outdoor recreation
Property rights
Public lands and natural resources
Roads and highways
State and local government operations
Wilderness and natural areas, wildlife refuges, wild rivers, habitats
Government studies and investigations
Hunting and fishing
Land use and conservation
Maine
Outdoor recreation
Property rights
Public lands and natural resources
Roads and highways
State and local government operations
Wilderness and natural areas, wildlife refuges, wild rivers, habitats