US HB2187 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-3)
Status: Introduced on April 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-15 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-15 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes a nonimmigrant visa for qualified Canadian citizens and makes various amendments related to nonimmigrant visas. The Department of Homeland Security (DHS) may admit as a visitor a Canadian citizen who (1) is at least 50 years old, (2) maintains a residence in Canada, (3) owns a U.S. residence or has signed a rental agreement for the duration of the stay, (4) is not inadmissible or deportable under various provisions, (5) will not engage in U.S. employment, and (6) will not seek U.S. assistance or benefits. Such visitors may be admitted for up to 240 days out of any single 365-day period. The Visa Waiver Program (program allowing citizens of participating countries to visit the United States without a visa) shall be renamed the Secure Travel Partnership Program. The bill amends various provisions relating to the program, such as the maximum nonimmigrant visa refusal rate a qualifying country may have. DHS may waive the refusal rate requirement if a country meets other requirements, such as entering into intelligence collection and information sharing arrangements with the United States. The Department of State shall set a goal of interviewing nonimmigrant visa applicants worldwide within 15 days of receiving the application and periodically report to Congress on efforts to meet this goal. The State Department shall conduct a pilot program for using secure remote videoconferencing technology for conducting visa interviews for certain classes of nonimmigrant visa applications.
Title
JOLT Act of 2019 Jobs Originated through Launching Travel Act of 2019
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Quigley [D-IL] | Rep. Tom Rice [R-SC] | Rep. Daniel Lipinski [D-IL] | Rep. Jeff Van Drew [R-NJ] |
Rep. Earl Blumenauer [D-OR] | Rep. Salud Carbajal [D-CA] | Rep. Scott Peters [D-CA] | Rep. Kathy Castor [D-FL] |
Rep. Danny Davis [D-IL] | Rep. Suzanne Lee [D-NV] | Rep. Dan Crenshaw [R-TX] | Rep. Elaine Luria [D-VA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-15 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship. |
2019-04-09 | House | Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary. |
2019-04-09 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB3241 (Related) 2019-06-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
SB2507 (Related) 2019-09-18 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB4498 (Related) 2019-10-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
SB2507 (Related) 2019-09-18 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB4498 (Related) 2019-10-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Administrative remedies
Border security and unlawful immigration
Canada
Congressional oversight
Department of Homeland Security
Employee benefits and pensions
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government information and archives
Immigration
Immigration status and procedures
Income tax deferral
Intelligence activities, surveillance, classified information
Judicial review and appeals
Terrorism
Travel and tourism
Visas and passports
Administrative remedies
Border security and unlawful immigration
Canada
Congressional oversight
Department of Homeland Security
Employee benefits and pensions
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government information and archives
Immigration
Immigration status and procedures
Income tax deferral
Intelligence activities, surveillance, classified information
Judicial review and appeals
Terrorism
Travel and tourism
Visas and passports
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/2187/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr2187/BILLS-116hr2187ih.pdf |