US HB4498 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Introduced on September 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-10-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-10-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes a nonimmigrant visa for qualified Canadian citizens. The Department of Homeland Security may admit as a visitor a Canadian citizen who (1) is at least 55 years old, (2) maintains a residence in Canada, (3) owns a U.S. residence or has signed a rental agreement for the duration of the stay, (4) is not inadmissible or deportable under various provisions, (5) will not engage in U.S. employment, and (6) will not seek U.S. assistance or benefits. Such visitors may be admitted for up to 240 days out of any single 365-day period.
Title
Promoting Tourism to Enhance our Economy Act of 2019
Sponsors
Rep. Albio Sires [D-NJ] | Rep. Ted Yoho [R-FL] | Rep. Theodore Deutch [D-FL] | Rep. Frank Pallone [D-NJ] |
Rep. Bill Pascrell [D-NJ] | Rep. Donna Shalala [D-FL] | Rep. Darren Soto [D-FL] | Rep. Brad Sherman [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-28 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship. |
2019-09-25 | House | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-09-25 | House | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-09-25 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB2187 (Related) 2019-05-15 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
HB3241 (Related) 2019-06-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
SB2507 (Related) 2019-09-18 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB3241 (Related) 2019-06-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
SB2507 (Related) 2019-09-18 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Subjects
Canada
Immigration
Immigration status and procedures
Marriage and family status
Travel and tourism
Visas and passports
Immigration
Immigration status and procedures
Marriage and family status
Travel and tourism
Visas and passports
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/4498/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr4498/BILLS-116hr4498ih.pdf |