US HB2165 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on May 23 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-07-08 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health, Employment, Labor, and Pensions.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health, Employment, Labor, and Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 23 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-07-08 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health, Employment, Labor, and Pensions.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health, Employment, Labor, and Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Ensuring Quality Health Care for All Americans Act of 2013 - States that this Act shall take effect upon the repeal, required by this Act, of the Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act (PPACA) and the health care provisions of the Health Care and Education Reconciliation Act of 2010. Restores or revives the provisions of law amended or repealed by PPACA and such health care provisions as if they had not been enacted and without further amendment to them. Revises Public Health Service Act provisions concerning health insurance coverage to require each health insurance issuer offering health insurance coverage in the group market (currently, individual or group market) in a state to accept every employer and every individual in a group (currently, every employer and every individual) in the state applying for such coverage. Prohibits a group health plan or a health insurance issuer offering group health insurance coverage from imposing: (1) any preexisting condition exclusion with respect to such plan or coverage, or (2) lifetime or annual limits. Requires dependent coverage beyond age 18 until the first of either a dependent turning 26, marrying, or no longer residing at home. Requires plans to offer catastrophic coverage and sets forth coverage requirements. Directs the Secretary of Health and Human Services (HHS) to make grants to States for planning for the establishment and implementation of health insurance risk adjustment mechanisms. Sets forth provisions limiting the liability of health care providers.
Title
Ensuring Quality Health Care for All Americans Act of 2013
Sponsors
Rep. Joseph Heck [R-NV] | Rep. Michael Fitzpatrick [R-PA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-08 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health, Employment, Labor, and Pensions. |
2013-06-19 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2013-06-14 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution and Civil Justice. |
2013-05-24 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2013-05-23 | House | Referred to House Judiciary |
2013-05-23 | House | Referred to House Ways and Means |
2013-05-23 | House | Referred to House Education and the Workforce |
2013-05-23 | House | Referred to House Energy and Commerce |
2013-05-23 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Education and the Workforce, Ways and Means, and the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
Subjects
Child health
Civil actions and liability
Comprehensive health care
Disability and health-based discrimination
Employee benefits and pensions
Family relationships
Federal preemption
General health and health care finance matters
Health
Health care costs and insurance
Health care coverage and access
Health care quality
Health programs administration and funding
Higher education
Legal fees and court costs
Medicaid
Civil actions and liability
Comprehensive health care
Disability and health-based discrimination
Employee benefits and pensions
Family relationships
Federal preemption
General health and health care finance matters
Health
Health care costs and insurance
Health care coverage and access
Health care quality
Health programs administration and funding
Higher education
Legal fees and court costs
Medicaid
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/113th-congress/house-bill/2165/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/113/bills/hr2165/BILLS-113hr2165ih.pdf |