US HB214 | 2009-2010 | 111th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-01-06 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-01-06 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amends the Internal Revenue Code to allow purchasers of a single-family principal residence a one-time tax credit for up to $15,000 of the purchase price. Requires such a residence to be purchased after February 29, 2008, and before March 1, 2009, and that it be: (1) a new previously unoccupied residence for which a building permit has been issued and construction began on or before September 1, 2007; (2) an owner-occupied residence with a mortgage indebtedness in default on or before March 1, 2008; or (3) in foreclosure and owned by the mortgagor or the mortgagor's agent.
Title
To amend the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 to provide a Federal income tax credit for certain home purchases.
Sponsors
Rep. John Duncan [R-TN] | Rep. Joe Wilson [R-SC] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-01-06 | Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means. |
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/111th-congress/house-bill/214/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/111/bills/hr214/BILLS-111hr214ih.pdf |