US HB2135 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-2)
Status: Introduced on April 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-08 - Referred to the House Committee on House Administration.
Pending: House Administration Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-08 - Referred to the House Committee on House Administration.
Pending: House Administration Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits foreign nationals from making disbursements for political advertising.
Title
PAID AD Act Preventing Adversaries Internationally from Disbursing Advertising Dollars Act
Sponsors
Rep. Elissa Slotkin [D-MI] | Rep. Elise Stefanik [R-NY] | Rep. Abigail Spanberger [D-VA] | Rep. Dean Phillips [D-MN] |
Rep. Jim Cooper [D-TN] | Rep. Angela Craig [D-MN] | Rep. Ben McAdams [D-UT] | Rep. Jeff Van Drew [R-NJ] |
Rep. Kendra Horn [D-OK] | Rep. Scott Peters [D-CA] | Rep. Jim Costa [D-CA] | Rep. Rebecca Sherrill [D-NJ] |
Rep. Julia Brownley [D-CA] | Rep. David Scott [D-GA] | Rep. Elaine Luria [D-VA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-08 | House | Referred to the House Committee on House Administration. |
2019-04-08 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB949 (Related) 2019-03-28 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB1962 (Related) 2019-06-25 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration.
HB4612 (Related) 2019-10-04 - Referred to the House Committee on House Administration.
SB1962 (Related) 2019-06-25 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration.
HB4612 (Related) 2019-10-04 - Referred to the House Committee on House Administration.
Subjects
Elections, voting, political campaign regulation
Government operations and politics
Internet and video services
Political advertising
Subversive activities
Television and film
Government operations and politics
Internet and video services
Political advertising
Subversive activities
Television and film
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/2135/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr2135/BILLS-116hr2135ih.pdf |