US HB4612 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on October 4 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-10-04 - Referred to the House Committee on House Administration.
Pending: House Administration Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Firewall Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Firewall Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-10-04HouseReferred to the House Committee on House Administration.
2019-10-04HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

HB1 (Related) 2019-03-14 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 39.
HB2135 (Related) 2019-04-08 - Referred to the House Committee on House Administration.
HB2977 (Related) 2019-05-23 - Referred to the Committee on House Administration, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
HB4617 (Related) 2019-10-16 - Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 6 - 1.
SB949 (Related) 2019-03-28 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB1147 (Related) 2019-04-11 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration.
SB1962 (Related) 2019-06-25 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback