US HB2123 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on March 23 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-07 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 264.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 23 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-07 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 264.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend the Dodd-Frank Wall Street Reform and Consumer Protection Act to require regulated entities to provide information necessary for the Offices of Women and Minority Inclusion to carry out their duties, and for other purposes.
Title
Diversity and Inclusion Data Accountability and Transparency Act of 2021
Sponsors
Rep. Joyce Beatty [D-OH] | Rep. Nikema Williams [D-GA] | Rep. Jesus Garcia [D-IL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-07 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 264. |
2022-06-07 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Financial Services. H. Rept. 117-350. |
2021-04-21 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 30 - 23. |
2021-04-20 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2021-03-23 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services. |
2021-03-23 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB2001 (Related) 2021-03-18 - Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services.