US HB2116 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-6)
Status: Engrossed on May 21 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-21 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
Pending: Senate Foreign Relations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 21 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-21 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
Pending: Senate Foreign Relations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Directs the Department of State to establish the interagency Global Fragility Initiative to stabilize conflict-affected areas and prevent violence globally, and establishes funds to support such efforts. The State Department shall devise a plan for the initiative, including its organizational structure and goals. The State Department shall lead in foreign policy, diplomatic, and political efforts. The U.S. Agency for International Development shall lead in development, humanitarian, and non-security policies. Other departments and agencies, including the Department of Defense, shall provide support as necessary. The State Department shall select priority countries and regions that are particularly at risk, and report to Congress 10-year plans for each. Each plan shall include information including descriptions of goals, plans for reaching such goals, and benchmarks for measuring progress. The State Department shall report to Congress every two years about the initiative's progress. The Government Accountability Office shall consult Congress every two years about opportunities to assess the initiative and recommend improvements. The bill creates the Stabilization and Prevention Fund to support efforts to stabilize conflict-affected areas, including areas at risk from the Islamic State of Iraq and Syria or other terrorist organizations. The bill establishes the Complex Crises Fund to support programs to address emerging, unforeseen, or complex challenges abroad.
Title
Global Fragility Act
Sponsors
Rep. Eliot Engel [D-NY] | Rep. Michael McCaul [R-TX] | Rep. Ann Wagner [R-MO] | Rep. Francis Rooney [R-FL] |
Rep. Adam Smith [D-WA] | Rep. William Keating [D-MA] | Rep. Ted Lieu [D-CA] | Rep. Ron Wright [R-TX] |
Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA] | Rep. Tom Malinowski [D-NJ] | Rep. Brad Sherman [D-CA] | Rep. Ilhan Omar [D-MN] |
Rep. Jim Cooper [D-TN] | Rep. Don Beyer [D-VA] | Rep. Chellie Pingree [D-ME] | Rep. Gregory Pence [R-IN] |
Rep. Andy Kim [D-NJ] | Rep. Ron Kind [D-WI] | Rep. James McGovern [D-MA] | Rep. Ed Case [D-HI] |
Rep. Karen Bass [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-21 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. |
2019-05-20 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2019-05-20 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H3966-3968) |
2019-05-20 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2116. |
2019-05-20 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H3966-3969) |
2019-05-20 | House | Mr. Engel moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2019-04-09 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-04-09 | House | Committee Agreed to Seek Consideration Under Suspension of the Rules. |
2019-04-09 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2019-04-08 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs. |
2019-04-08 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB1580 (Related) 2019-03-07 - Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committee on Appropriations, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Subjects
Conflicts and wars
Congressional oversight
Crimes against children
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
Foreign aid and international relief
Government ethics and transparency, public corruption
Government studies and investigations
Government trust funds
Human rights
International affairs
International organizations and cooperation
Middle East
Military assistance, sales, and agreements
Multilateral development programs
Political movements and philosophies
Public-private cooperation
Racial and ethnic relations
Reconstruction and stabilization
Religion
Research and development
Sovereignty, recognition, national governance and status
Terrorism
U.S. Agency for International Development (USAID)
Congressional oversight
Crimes against children
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
Foreign aid and international relief
Government ethics and transparency, public corruption
Government studies and investigations
Government trust funds
Human rights
International affairs
International organizations and cooperation
Middle East
Military assistance, sales, and agreements
Multilateral development programs
Political movements and philosophies
Public-private cooperation
Racial and ethnic relations
Reconstruction and stabilization
Religion
Research and development
Sovereignty, recognition, national governance and status
Terrorism
U.S. Agency for International Development (USAID)