US HB2112 | 2009-2010 | 111th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 53-9)
Status: Introduced on April 27 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-06-08 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Military Personnel Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 27 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-06-08 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Military Personnel Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Lung Cancer Mortality Reduction Act of 2009 - Amends the Public Health Service Act to require the Secretary of Health and Human Services (the HHS Secretary) to implement the Lung Cancer Mortality Reduction Program to achieve a reduction of at least 25% in the mortality rate of lung cancer by 2015. Includes within such program: (1) a strategic review and prioritization of research grants; (2) an expansion of research programs, such as on predispositions to lung cancer; and (3) the expedited development of computer assisted diagnostic, surgical, treatment, and drug testing innovations. Amends the Federal Food, Drug, and Cosmetic Act to apply provisions related to drugs for rare diseases or conditions to: (1) chemoprevention drugs for precancerous conditions of the lungs; (2) drugs for targeted therapeutic treatment of lung cancer; and (3) drugs to curtail or prevent nicotine addiction. Requires the HHS Secretary to establish an early disease research and management program targeted at the high incidence and mortality rates of lung cancer among minority and low income populations. Requires the Secretary of Defense (DOD) and the Secretary of Veterans Affairs (VA) to coordinate with the HHS Secretary in: (1) the development of the Lung Cancer Mortality Reduction Program; (2) the implementation of an early detection and disease management research program for military personnel and veterans whose smoking history and exposure to carcinogens during active duty service has increased their risk for lung cancer; and (3) the implementation of coordinated care programs for military personnel and veterans diagnosed with lung cancer. Requires the HHS Secretary to convene a Lung Cancer Advisory Board to monitor the programs established under this Act.
Title
Lung Cancer Mortality Reduction Act of 2009
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-08 | Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel. | |
2009-05-01 | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. | |
2009-04-28 | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. | |
2009-04-27 | Referred to House Veterans' Affairs | |
2009-04-27 | Referred to House Armed Services | |
2009-04-27 | Referred to House Energy and Commerce | |
2009-04-27 | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Armed Services, and Veterans' Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
Same As/Similar To
SB332 (Related) 2009-01-27 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. (text of measure as introduced: CR S897-898)
Subjects
Advisory bodies
Cancer
Cardiovascular and respiratory health
Drug and radiation therapy
Drug, alcohol, tobacco use
Health
Health programs administration and funding
Health promotion and preventive care
Health technology, devices, supplies
Medical research
Medical tests and diagnostic methods
Military medicine
Minority health
Research administration and funding
Surgery and anesthesia
Veterans' medical care
Cancer
Cardiovascular and respiratory health
Drug and radiation therapy
Drug, alcohol, tobacco use
Health
Health programs administration and funding
Health promotion and preventive care
Health technology, devices, supplies
Medical research
Medical tests and diagnostic methods
Military medicine
Minority health
Research administration and funding
Surgery and anesthesia
Veterans' medical care
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/111th-congress/house-bill/2112/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/111/bills/hr2112/BILLS-111hr2112ih.pdf |