US HB2088 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on November 3 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-11-17 - Committee on Indian Affairs. Hearings held. Hearings printed: S.Hrg. 117-115.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on November 3 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-11-17 - Committee on Indian Affairs. Hearings held. Hearings printed: S.Hrg. 117-115.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To take certain Federal lands in Tennessee into trust for the benefit of the Eastern Band of Cherokee Indians, and for other purposes.
Title
Eastern Band of Cherokee Historic Lands Reacquisition Act
Sponsors
Rep. Charles Fleischmann [R-TN] |
Roll Calls
2021-11-02 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended (Y: 407 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-11-17 | Senate | Committee on Indian Affairs. Hearings held. Hearings printed: S.Hrg. 117-115. |
2021-11-03 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Indian Affairs. |
2021-11-02 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2021-11-02 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 407 - 16 (Roll no. 347). (text: 11/1/2021 CR H6050-6051) |
2021-11-02 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H6098-6099) |
2021-11-01 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2021-11-01 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2088. |
2021-11-01 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H6050-6052) |
2021-11-01 | House | Ms. Leger Fernandez moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2021-11-01 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 119. |
2021-11-01 | House | Reported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 117-164. |
2021-10-13 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent. |
2021-10-13 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2021-10-13 | House | Subcommittee for Indigenous Peoples of the United States Discharged. |
2021-05-21 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee for Indigenous Peoples of the United States. |
2021-03-19 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2021-03-19 | House | Introduced in House |