US HB2082 | 2011-2012 | 112th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-11)
Status: Introduced on June 1 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-06-24 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Military Personnel Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 1 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-06-24 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Military Personnel Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Work Opportunity Credit Improvements Act - Amends the Internal Revenue Code to: (1) extend through 2014 the work opportunity tax credit, (2) allow employers to certify certain employees as members of a targeted group for purposes of such credit in lieu of obtaining certification from a state employment security agency, (3) expand the definition of "qualified veteran" for purposes of such credit to include any recently discharged veteran and any veteran receiving specified benefits, and (4) allow such credit for the hiring of high-risk youth who begin work during the period of 2009 through 2014. Directs the Department of Defense (DOD) or the National Guard, as applicable, to provide individuals discharged or released from the Armed Forces or the National Guard with information and documentation necessary for qualifying for the work opportunity tax credit as a recently discharged veteran.
Title
Work Opportunity Credit Improvements Act
Sponsors
Rep. Aaron Schock [R-IL] | Rep. Dan Boren [D-OK] | Rep. Charles Boustany [R-LA] | Rep. Lacy Clay [D-MO] |
Rep. Joseph Crowley [D-NY] | Rep. Danny Davis [D-IL] | Rep. Michael Doyle [D-PA] | Rep. Michael Fitzpatrick [R-PA] |
Rep. Marcia Fudge [D-OH] | Rep. Jim Gerlach [R-PA] | Rep. Charles Gonzalez [D-TX] | Rep. Lynn Jenkins [R-KS] |
Rep. Ron Kind [D-WI] | Rep. John Lewis [D-GA] | Rep. Daniel Lungren [R-CA] | Rep. Jim McDermott [D-WA] |
Rep. James McGovern [D-MA] | Rep. Richard Neal [D-MA] | Rep. Bill Pascrell [D-NJ] | Rep. Ron Paul [R-TX] |
Rep. Mike Pence [R-IN] | Sen. Gary Peters [D-MI] | Rep. Jared Polis [D-CO] | Rep. Charles Rangel [D-NY] |
Rep. Tom Reed [R-NY] | Rep. Steven Rothman [D-NJ] | Rep. Fortney Stark [D-CA] | Rep. Steve Stivers [R-OH] |
Rep. Edolphus Towns [D-NY] | Rep. Allen West [R-FL] | Rep. Frederica Wilson [D-FL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-24 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel. |
2011-06-01 | House | Referred to House Armed Services |
2011-06-01 | House | Referred to House Ways and Means |
2011-06-01 | House | Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
Same As/Similar To
HB865 (Related) 2011-03-15 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
SB146 (Related) 2011-01-25 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB146 (Related) 2011-01-25 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Subjects
Employee hiring
Employment and training programs
Income tax credits
Taxation
Veterans' education, employment, rehabilitation
Wages and earnings
Youth employment and child labor
Employment and training programs
Income tax credits
Taxation
Veterans' education, employment, rehabilitation
Wages and earnings
Youth employment and child labor
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/112th-congress/house-bill/2082/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/112/bills/hr2082/BILLS-112hr2082ih.pdf |