US HB2070 | 2011-2012 | 112th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 54-4)
Status: Engrossed on January 26 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-26 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
Pending: Senate Energy And Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 26 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-26 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
Pending: Senate Energy And Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
World War II Memorial Prayer Act of 2012 - Directs the Secretary of the Interior to install at the World War II memorial in the District of Columbia a suitable plaque or an inscription with the words that President Franklin D. Roosevelt prayed with the nation on June 6, 1944, the morning of D-Day.
Title
World War II Memorial Prayer Act of 2012
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-01-24 - House - On Motion to Suspend the Rules and Pass, as Amended (Y: 386 N: 26 NV: 21 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-24 - House - On Motion to Suspend the Rules and Pass, as Amended (Y: 386 N: 26 NV: 21 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-24 - House - On Motion to Suspend the Rules and Pass, as Amended (Y: 386 N: 26 NV: 21 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-26 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. |
2012-01-24 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 386 - 26 (Roll no. 8). (text: CR H131) |
2012-01-24 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2012-01-24 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H149-150) |
2012-01-24 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2012-01-24 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2070. |
2012-01-24 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H131-132) |
2012-01-24 | House | Mr. Johnson (OH) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2012-01-18 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 249. |
2012-01-18 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 112-368. |
2011-11-17 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent. |
2011-11-17 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2011-11-17 | House | Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests and Public Lands Discharged. |
2011-11-03 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2011-06-09 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests and Public Lands. |
2011-06-01 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
Same As/Similar To
SB3078 (Related) 2012-06-27 - Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks. Hearings held. With printed Hearing: S.Hrg. 112-578.
Subjects
Conflicts and wars
District of Columbia
Europe
Military history
Monuments and memorials
Presidents and presidential powers
Public lands and natural resources
U.S. history
District of Columbia
Europe
Military history
Monuments and memorials
Presidents and presidential powers
Public lands and natural resources
U.S. history