US HB204 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 20-1)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-30 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Trade.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Trade Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-30 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Trade.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Trade Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
North Korea Sanctions and Diplomatic Nonrecognition Act of 2015 Continues diplomatic, economic, and military sanctions against the government of North Korea as a supporter of international terrorism until the President certifies to Congress that North Korea: is no longer engaged in the illegal transfer of missile or nuclear technology, particularly to Iran, Syria, or Burma; is not assisting foreign terrorist organizations, engaged in counterfeiting U.S. currency, or engaged in illicit narcotics traffic; has returned the last remains of Reverend Kim Dong-shik to the United States; has released abducted Japanese nationals and surviving Korean War prisoners of war; has undertaken specified actions regarding family reunification, penal reforms, refugee access, and religious organization communications; and is no longer engaged in cyber-attacks against the United States, its government, infrastructure, entities, or citizens, or those of its allies. Expresses the sense of Congress that the Secretary of State should redesignate North Korea as a state sponsor of terrorism. Finds that the United States did not grant diplomatic recognition to North Korea upon its establishment as a client regime of the former Soviet Union in 1948. Continues diplomatic nonrecognition of North Korea until such benchmarks have been met. Directs the President, given North Korea's third nuclear weapons test on February 12, 2013, in violation of U.N. Security Council Resolutions 1695, 1718, 1874, and 2087 to instruct the U.S. Permanent Representative to the United Nations to use U.S. influence to secure adoption of a Security Council resolution condemning North Korea's action as a violation of such Resolutions and requiring implementation of comprehensive sanctions and an inspection regime against North Korea.
Title
North Korea Sanctions and Diplomatic Nonrecognition Act of 2015
Sponsors
Rep. Ileana Ros-Lehtinen [R-FL] | Rep. Gerald Connolly [D-VA] | Rep. Matt Salmon [R-AZ] | Rep. Steve Chabot [R-OH] |
Rep. Ted Poe [R-TX] | Rep. Randy Weber [R-TX] | Rep. Carlos Curbelo [R-FL] | Rep. Pete Olson [R-TX] |
Rep. Michael Burgess [R-TX] | Rep. Gus Bilirakis [R-FL] | Rep. Curt Clawson [R-FL] | Rep. Reid Ribble [R-WI] |
Rep. John Kline [R-MN] | Rep. Darrell Issa [R-CA] | Rep. Joe Wilson [R-SC] | Rep. Randy Forbes [R-VA] |
Rep. Austin Scott [R-GA] | Rep. Scott DesJarlais [R-TN] | Rep. Bill Johnson [R-OH] | Rep. Thomas MacArthur [R-NJ] |
Rep. Sam Johnson [R-TX] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-30 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Trade. |
2015-02-11 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Asia and the Pacific. |
2015-01-08 | House | Referred to House Ways and Means |
2015-01-08 | House | Referred to House Foreign Affairs |
2015-01-08 | House | Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2015-01-08 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Arms control and nonproliferation
Asia
Burma
Computer security and identity theft
Conflicts and wars
Congressional oversight
Currency
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
Drug trafficking and controlled substances
Foreign aid and international relief
Human rights
International affairs
International law and treaties
Iran
Japan
Middle East
News media and reporting
North Korea
Nuclear weapons
Refugees, asylum, displaced persons
Sanctions
South Korea
Sovereignty, recognition, national governance and status
Syria
Terrorism
Trade restrictions
United Nations
Asia
Burma
Computer security and identity theft
Conflicts and wars
Congressional oversight
Currency
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
Drug trafficking and controlled substances
Foreign aid and international relief
Human rights
International affairs
International law and treaties
Iran
Japan
Middle East
News media and reporting
North Korea
Nuclear weapons
Refugees, asylum, displaced persons
Sanctions
South Korea
Sovereignty, recognition, national governance and status
Syria
Terrorism
Trade restrictions
United Nations
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/114th-congress/house-bill/204/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/114/bills/hr204/BILLS-114hr204ih.pdf |