US HB2031 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-3)
Status: Introduced on April 2 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-07-16 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 2 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-07-16 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Replaces the Tribal Self-Governance Demonstration Project with the Tribal Self-Governance Program. Under the program, Native American tribes or organizations may receive grants to plan for participation in self-governance and to negotiate the terms of participation. In addition, the bill revises the Department of the Interior's process for approving self-governance compacts and funding agreements with tribes. Interior must negotiate contracts and funding agreements to maximize implementation of the self-governance policy. The bill sets forth requirements for tribes participating in self-governance with respect to conflicts of interest, audits, redesign and consolidation of programs, retrocession of programs, nonduplication of funding, and records. Funding agreements must include provisions for Interior to monitor the performance of trust functions by the tribe and to reassume a program and funding under specified circumstances. Tribes participating in self-governance may elect to assume some federal responsibilities with respect to certain construction projects. The bill prohibits a tribe from being obligated to continue performance of a compact or funding agreement that provides insufficient funding.
Title
PROGRESS for Indian Tribes Act Practical Reforms and Other Goals to Reinforce the Effectiveness of Self-Governance and Self-Determination for Indian Tribes Act of 2019
Sponsors
Rep. Debra Haaland [D-NM] | Rep. Tom Cole [R-OK] | Rep. Don Young [R-AK] | Rep. Denny Heck [D-WA] |
Rep. Tulsi Gabbard [D-HI] | Rep. Ruben Gallego [D-AZ] | Rep. Tom O'Halleran [D-AZ] | Rep. Tony Cardenas [D-CA] |
Rep. Barbara Lee [D-CA] | Rep. Gwen Moore [D-WI] | Rep. Derek Kilmer [D-WA] | Rep. Daniel Kildee [D-MI] |
Rep. Suzan DelBene [D-WA] | Rep. Kendra Horn [D-OK] | Sen. Markwayne Mullin [R-OK] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-16 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2019-04-30 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee for Indigenous Peoples of the United States. |
2019-04-02 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2019-04-02 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB209 (Same As) 2020-10-21 - Became Public Law No: 116-180. (TXT | PDF)
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Administrative remedies
Civil actions and liability
Department of the Interior
Evidence and witnesses
Federal-Indian relations
Indian claims
Indian lands and resources rights
Indian social and development programs
Judicial procedure and administration
Judicial review and appeals
Native Americans
Public contracts and procurement
Administrative remedies
Civil actions and liability
Department of the Interior
Evidence and witnesses
Federal-Indian relations
Indian claims
Indian lands and resources rights
Indian social and development programs
Judicial procedure and administration
Judicial review and appeals
Native Americans
Public contracts and procurement
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/2031/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr2031/BILLS-116hr2031ih.pdf |