US HB2030 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on April 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-06 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-06 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Savings Enhancement by Alleviating Leakage in 401(k) Savings Act This bill amends the Internal Revenue Code, with respect to loans made from a qualified employer plan, to extend the period for repayment of loans if a plan terminates or a plan participant becomes unemployed. The bill also requires the Department of the Treasury to modify regulations governing hardship distributions from qualified employer plans to allow participants to make additional contributions to a plan during the six-month period following a hardship distribution.
Title
Savings Enhancement by Alleviating Leakage in 401(k) Savings Act
Sponsors
Rep. Sam Johnson [R-TX] | Rep. Richard Neal [D-MA] | Rep. Vicente Gonzalez [D-TX] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-06 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means. |
2017-04-06 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB940 (Related) 2017-04-25 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB1 (Related) 2017-12-22 - Became Public Law No: 115-97. (TXT | PDF)
HR619 (Similar To) 2017-11-15 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
SB1 (Related) 2017-11-28 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 269.
HB1 (Related) 2017-12-22 - Became Public Law No: 115-97. (TXT | PDF)
HR619 (Similar To) 2017-11-15 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
SB1 (Related) 2017-11-28 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 269.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Consumer credit
Department of the Treasury
Employee benefits and pensions
Income tax exclusion
Taxation
Consumer credit
Department of the Treasury
Employee benefits and pensions
Income tax exclusion
Taxation
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-bill/2030/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hr2030/BILLS-115hr2030ih.pdf |