US HB2011 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Introduced on April 1 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-02 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 1 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-02 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend the Public Health Service Act with respect to the treatment under section 351(k)(7) of such Act (relating to exclusivity for reference products) of certain products deemed to have a biologics license pursuant to section 7002 of the Biologics Price Competition and Innovation Act of 2009.
Title
Protecting Access to Biosimilars Act of 2019
Sponsors
Rep. Diana DeGette [D-CO] | Rep. Tom Reed [R-NY] | Rep. Kim Schrier [D-WA] | Rep. Brett Guthrie [R-KY] |
Rep. Glenn Grothman [R-WI] | Rep. Dan Crenshaw [R-TX] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-02 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2019-04-01 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2019-04-01 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1140 (Related) 2019-04-11 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
SB1895 (Related) 2019-07-08 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 133.
SB1895 (Related) 2019-07-08 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 133.
Subjects
Allergies
Blood and blood diseases
Drug safety, medical device, and laboratory regulation
Health
Health promotion and preventive care
Health technology, devices, supplies
Immunology and vaccination
Licensing and registrations
Blood and blood diseases
Drug safety, medical device, and laboratory regulation
Health
Health promotion and preventive care
Health technology, devices, supplies
Immunology and vaccination
Licensing and registrations
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/2011/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr2011/BILLS-116hr2011ih.pdf |