US HB1995 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on March 17 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-18 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 17 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-18 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend the Immigration and Nationality Act with respect to aliens associated with criminal gangs, and for other purposes.
Title
Protecting Our Communities from Gang Violence Act of 2021
Sponsors
Rep. Lee Zeldin [R-NY] | Rep. Mo Brooks [R-AL] | Rep. Andrew Garbarino [R-NY] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-18 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship. |
2021-03-17 | House | Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary. |
2021-03-17 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB71 (Related) 2021-03-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
SB1056 (Related) 2021-03-25 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
SB1056 (Related) 2021-03-25 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-bill/1995/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hr1995/BILLS-117hr1995ih.pdf |