US HB1975 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 28 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-09-25 - Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Cybersecurity Advisory Committee Authorization Act of 2019 This bill requires the Department of Homeland Security to establish a cybersecurity advisory committee within the Cybersecurity and Infrastructure Security Agency (CISA) to consult on the development, refinement, and implementation of policies, programs, and security directives pertinent to the mission of CISA.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Cybersecurity Advisory Committee Authorization Act of 2019

Sponsors

Rep. John Katko [R-NY]Rep. Dan Newhouse [R-WA]Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA]Rep. Daniel Lipinski [D-IL]
Rep. Tom Graves [R-GA]Rep. Kendra Horn [D-OK]Rep. James Langevin [D-RI]Rep. Denver Riggleman [R-VA]
Rep. Elissa Slotkin [D-MI]Rep. Joseph Morelle [D-NY]Rep. Donald Payne [D-NJ]Rep. Luis Correa [D-CA]
Rep. Kathleen Rice [D-NY]Rep. Michael McCaul [R-TX]Rep. Bonnie Coleman [D-NJ]Rep. Val Demings [D-FL]
Rep. Will Hurd [R-TX]Rep. Yvette Clarke [D-NY]Rep. Gil Cisneros [D-CA]Rep. Elise Stefanik [R-NY]
Rep. Sanford Bishop [D-GA]Rep. Robin Kelly [D-IL]Rep. Barry Loudermilk [R-GA]Rep. John Ratcliffe [R-TX]
Rep. Ted Lieu [D-CA]Rep. Harley Rouda [D-CA]Rep. Jeff Van Drew [D-NJ]Rep. Xochitl Torres Small [D-NM]
Rep. Katie Hill [D-CA]Rep. Nanette Barragan [D-CA]Rep. TJ Cox [D-CA]Rep. Guy Reschenthaler [R-PA]
Rep. Matthew Cartwright [D-PA]Rep. Dean Phillips [D-MN]Rep. Cathy McMorris Rodgers [R-WA]Rep. Francis Rooney [R-FL]
Rep. Conor Lamb [D-PA]Rep. Cindy Axne [D-IA]Rep. Colin Allred [D-TX]Rep. David Trone [D-MD]
Rep. Chrissy Houlahan [D-PA]Rep. Abigail Spanberger [D-VA]Rep. Mark Walker [R-NC]Rep. Andy Kim [D-NJ]
Rep. Jenniffer Gonzalez-Colon [R-PR]Rep. Ed Case [D-HI]Rep. Steve Stivers [R-OH]Rep. Tony Cardenas [D-CA]
Rep. Susan Wild [D-PA]Rep. Seth Moulton [D-MA]Rep. Josh Gottheimer [D-NJ]Rep. Bill Johnson [R-OH]
Rep. Pete Stauber [R-MN]Rep. Anthony Brown [D-MD]Rep. John Joyce [R-PA]Rep. Peter King [R-NY]
Rep. Susan Davis [D-CA]Rep. Mike D. Rogers [R-AL]Rep. Clay Higgins [R-LA]Rep. David Joyce [R-OH]
Rep. Salud Carbajal [D-CA]Rep. Lauren Underwood [D-IL]Rep. Nicholas Taylor [R-TX]Rep. Michael Guest [R-MS]
Rep. Eric Crawford [R-AR]Rep. Max Rose [D-NY]Rep. David McKinley [R-WV]Rep. Abby Finkenauer [D-IA]
Rep. Debbie Lesko [D-AZ]Rep. Anthony Brindisi [D-NY]Rep. Michael Turner [R-OH]Rep. Ron Wright [R-TX]
Rep. Trent Kelly [R-MS]Rep. Anna Eshoo [D-CA]Rep. Christopher Pappas [D-NH]Rep. Vicky Hartzler [R-MO]
Rep. Paul Mitchell [R-MI]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-09-25HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent.
2019-09-25HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2019-09-25HouseSubcommittee on Cybersecurity, Infrastructure Protection, and Innovation Discharged.
2019-04-18HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Cybersecurity, Infrastructure Protection, and Innovation.
2019-03-29HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Energy.
2019-03-28HouseReferred to the Committee on Homeland Security, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, and Oversight and Reform, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-03-28HouseReferred to the Committee on Homeland Security, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, and Oversight and Reform, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-03-28HouseReferred to the Committee on Homeland Security, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, and Oversight and Reform, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-03-28HouseIntroduced in House

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback