US HB1975 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on April 22 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-19 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 385.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 22 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-19 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 385.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Securities and Exchange Commission Overpayment Credit Act (Sec. 2) This bill amends the Securities Exchange Act of 1934 to require the Securities and Exchange Commission (SEC) to offset future fees and assessments otherwise due from a national securities exchange or national securities association if it is informed within 10 years that the entity has overpaid past fees and assessments. This requirement applies to any fees and assessments paid before, on, or after the enactment of this Act.
Title
Securities and Exchange Commission Overpayment Credit Act
Sponsors
Rep. Gregory Meeks [D-NY] | Rep. Randy Hultgren [R-IL] | Rep. Bill Foster [D-IL] | Rep. Carolyn Maloney [D-NY] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-19 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 385. |
2016-04-19 | House | Reported by the Committee on Financial Services. H. Rept. 114-505. |
2015-05-20 | House | Ordered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 57 - 0. |
2015-05-20 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2015-04-29 | House | Hearings Held by the Subcommittee on Capital Markets and Government Sponsored Enterprises Prior to Referral. |
2015-04-22 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services. |
2015-04-22 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Executive agency funding and structure
Finance and financial sector
Securities
Securities and Exchange Commission (SEC)
User charges and fees
Finance and financial sector
Securities
Securities and Exchange Commission (SEC)
User charges and fees