US HB1922 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-5)
Status: Introduced on March 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-18 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 559.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-18 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 559.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Repeals provisions of the Internal Revenue Code, as added by the Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act, that limit payments for medications from health savings accounts, medical savings accounts, health flexible spending arrangements, and health reimbursement arrangements to only prescription drugs or insulin (thus allowing distributions from such accounts for over-the-counter drugs). The bill also allows the accounts to pay for menstrual care products.
Title
Restoring Access to Medication Act of 2019
Sponsors
Rep. Ron Kind [D-WI] | Rep. Grace Meng [D-NY] | Rep. Jackie Walorski [R-IN] | Rep. Darin LaHood [R-IL] |
Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA] | Rep. Peter DeFazio [D-OR] | Rep. Vicente Gonzalez [D-TX] | Rep. Julia Brownley [D-CA] |
Rep. Cindy Axne [D-IA] | Rep. Harley Rouda [D-CA] | Rep. Susan Wild [D-PA] | Rep. Mike Kelly [R-PA] |
Rep. Adrian Smith [R-NE] | Rep. Madeleine Dean [D-PA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-18 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 559. |
2020-12-18 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Ways and Means. H. Rept. 116-675. |
2019-10-23 | House | Ordered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2019-10-23 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-03-27 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2019-03-27 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means. |
2019-03-27 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB1322 (Related) 2019-05-24 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 60.
HB1332 (Related) 2019-02-26 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB1846 (Related) 2019-03-22 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB19 (Related) 2019-12-19 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Antitrust, Commercial, and Administrative Law.
SB3129 (Related) 2019-12-19 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB3548 (Related) 2020-06-03 - Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship. Hearings held.
HB748 (Related) 2020-07-23 - Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship. Hearings held.
HB1332 (Related) 2019-02-26 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB1846 (Related) 2019-03-22 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB19 (Related) 2019-12-19 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Antitrust, Commercial, and Administrative Law.
SB3129 (Related) 2019-12-19 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB3548 (Related) 2020-06-03 - Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship. Hearings held.
HB748 (Related) 2020-07-23 - Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship. Hearings held.
Subjects
Health care costs and insurance
Health technology, devices, supplies
Income tax deductions
Income tax exclusion
Taxation
Women's health
Health technology, devices, supplies
Income tax deductions
Income tax exclusion
Taxation
Women's health