US HB192 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 25-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 3 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-06-04 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 414.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 3 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-06-04 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 414.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To prohibit individuals who are not citizens of the United States from voting in elections in the District of Columbia.
Title
To prohibit individuals who are not citizens of the United States from voting in elections in the District of Columbia and to repeal the Local Resident Voting Rights Amendment Act of 2022
Sponsors
Rep. August Pfluger [R-TX] | Rep. Jake Ellzey [R-TX] | Rep. Paul Gosar [R-AZ] | Rep. Brian Babin [R-TX] |
Rep. Marjorie Greene [R-GA] | Rep. Nancy Mace [R-SC] | Rep. Bill Johnson [R-OH] | Rep. Mike Bost [R-IL] |
Rep. Patrick Fallon [R-TX] | Rep. Pete Sessions [R-TX] | Rep. Bill Posey [R-FL] | Rep. Vern Buchanan [R-FL] |
Rep. Virginia Foxx [R-NC] | Rep. Chris Stewart [R-UT] | Rep. Doug LaMalfa [R-CA] | Rep. Russell Fry [R-SC] |
Rep. Eric Crawford [R-AR] | Rep. Elizabeth Van Duyne [R-TX] | Rep. Andrew Clyde [R-GA] | Rep. Claudia Tenney [R-NY] |
Rep. Byron Donalds [R-FL] | Rep. Brad Wenstrup [R-OH] | Rep. David Rouzer [R-NC] | Rep. William Timmons [R-SC] |
Rep. Burgess Owens [R-UT] |
Roll Calls
2024-05-23 - House - On Passage RC# 232 (Y: 262 N: 143 NV: 0 Abs: 25) [PASS]
2024-05-23 - House - On Motion to Recommit RC# 231 (Y: 195 N: 212 NV: 0 Abs: 23) [FAIL]
2024-05-23 - House - On Motion to Recommit RC# 231 (Y: 195 N: 212 NV: 0 Abs: 23) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-04 | Senate | Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 414. |
2024-06-03 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read the first time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under Read the First Time. |
2024-05-23 | House | The title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection. |
2024-05-23 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2024-05-23 | House | On passage Passed by recorded vote: 262 - 143 (Roll no. 232). |
2024-05-23 | House | On motion to recommit Failed by the Yeas and Nays: 195 - 212 (Roll no. 231). |
2024-05-23 | House | Considered as unfinished business. |
2024-05-23 | House | POSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - At the conclusion of debate on H.R. 192, the Chair put the question on the motion to recommit and by voice vote, announced that the nays had prevailed. Mr. Robert Garcia (CA) demanded the yeas and nays and the Chair postponed further proceedings until a time to be announced. |
2024-05-23 | House | The previous question on the motion to recommit was ordered pursuant to clause 2(b) of rule XIX. |
2024-05-23 | House | Mr. Garcia, Robert moved to recommit to the Committee on Oversight and Accountability. |
2024-05-23 | House | The previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule. |
2024-05-23 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H.R. 192. |
2024-05-23 | House | Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 4763, H.R. 5403 and H.R. 192. The resolution provides for one hour of debate on each bill. H.R. 4763 and H.R. 5403 are considered under a structured rule and H.R. 192 is considered under a closed rule. The resolution provides for one motion to recommit on each bill. |
2024-05-23 | House | Considered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 1243. |
2024-05-22 | House | Rule H. Res. 1243 passed House. |
2024-05-21 | House | Rules Committee Resolution H. Res. 1243 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 4763, H.R. 5403 and H.R. 192. The resolution provides for one hour of debate on each bill. H.R. 4763 and H.R. 5403 are considered under a structured rule and H.R. 192 is considered under a closed rule. The resolution provides for one motion to recommit on each bill. |
2023-07-18 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 118. |
2023-07-18 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Oversight and Accountability. H. Rept. 118-150. |
2023-07-12 | House | Ordered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 23 - 19. |
2023-07-12 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held |
2023-01-09 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Accountability. |
2023-01-09 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HR1243 (Related) 2024-05-22 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.