US HB1917 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-03-08 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
Pending: Senate Environment And Public Works Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Blocking Regulatory Interference from Closing Kilns Act of 2017 (Sec. 2) This bill prohibits the Environmental Protection Agency from requiring compliance with Clean Air Act rules concerning national emission standards for hazardous air pollutants with respect to brick and structural clay products manufacturing or clay ceramics manufacturing until judicial reviews of the rules are complete. (Sec. 3) This bill delays by three years the date by which manufacturers, owners, and operators of new residential wood heaters, including residential hydronic heaters (wood-fired boilers) and forced-air furnaces, must comply with emission standards promulgated under the Clean Air Act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Blocking Regulatory Interference from Closing Kilns Act of 2017

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-07 - House - On motion to recommit with instructions RC# 98 (Y: 186 N: 227 NV: 17 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-07 - House - On passage RC# 99 (Y: 234 N: 180 NV: 16 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-08SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
2018-03-07HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2018-03-07HouseOn passage Passed by recorded vote: 234 - 180, 1 Present (Roll no. 99). (text: CR H1458-1459)
2018-03-07HouseOn motion to recommit with instructions Failed by the Yeas and Nays: 186 - 227 (Roll no. 98).
2018-03-07HouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H1465-1466)
2018-03-07HousePOSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - At the conclusion of debate on the Castor (FL) motion to recommit, the Chair put the question on adoption of the motion and by voice vote, announced the noes had prevailed. Ms. Castor (FL) demanded the yeas and nays and the Chair postponed further proceedings on the motion to recommit until later in the legislative day.
2018-03-07HouseThe previous question on the motion to recommit with instructions was ordered without objection.
2018-03-07HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with 10 minutes of debate on the Castor (FL) motion to recommit with instructions. The instructions contained in the motion seek to require the bill to be reported back to the House with an amendment to the bill to add a new subsection entitled "Limitation on Private Plane Travel".
2018-03-07HouseMs. Castor (FL) moved to recommit with instructions to the Committee on Energy and Commerce. (text: CR H1464)
2018-03-07HouseThe previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule.
2018-03-07HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H.R. 1917.
2018-03-07HouseRule provides for consideration of H.R. 1119 and H.R. 1917 under closed rules. Each measure shall be debatable for one hour equally divided and controlled by the Chair and Ranking Member of the Committee on Energy and Commerce. The rule provides for one motion to recommit with or without instructions on each measure.
2018-03-07HouseConsidered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 762. (consideration: CR H1458-1465)
2018-03-07HouseRule H. Res. 762 passed House.
2018-03-05HouseRules Committee Resolution H. Res. 762 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 1119 and H.R. 1917. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 1119 and H.R. 1917 under closed rules. Each measure shall be debatable for one hour equally divided and controlled by the Chair and Ranking Member of the Committee on Energy and Commerce. The rule provides for one motion to recommit with or without instructions on each measure.
2018-01-10HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 379.
2018-01-10HouseReported by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 115-509.
2017-12-06HouseOrdered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 31 - 23.
2017-12-06HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2017-11-15HouseForwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by the Yeas and Nays: 12 - 10 .
2017-11-15HouseSubcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2017-04-07HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Environment.
2017-04-05HouseReferred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
2017-04-05HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SB839 (Same As) 2017-11-14 - Committee on Environment and Public Works Senate Subcommittee on Clean Air and Nuclear Safety. Hearings held. With printed Hearing: S.Hrg. 115-127.
HR762 (Related) 2018-03-07 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB453 (Related) 2018-01-10 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 378.
SB2461 (Related) 2018-12-04 - By Senator Barrasso from Committee on Environment and Public Works filed written report. Report No. 115-407. Minority views filed.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback