US SB2461 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 27 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-12-04 - By Senator Barrasso from Committee on Environment and Public Works filed written report. Report No. 115-407. Minority views filed.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Blocking Regulatory Interference from Closing Kilns Act of 2018

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Blocking Regulatory Interference from Closing Kilns Act of 2018

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-12-04SenateBy Senator Barrasso from Committee on Environment and Public Works filed written report. Report No. 115-407. Minority views filed.
2018-09-18SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 577.
2018-09-18SenateCommittee on Environment and Public Works. Reported by Senator Barrasso without amendment. Without written report.
2018-09-18SenateCommittee on Environment and Public Works. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
2018-02-27SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.

Same As/Similar To

HB1917 (Related) 2018-03-08 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
SB839 (Related) 2017-11-14 - Committee on Environment and Public Works Senate Subcommittee on Clean Air and Nuclear Safety. Hearings held. With printed Hearing: S.Hrg. 115-127.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback