US HB1898 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 32-19)
Status: Introduced on April 4 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-07-11 - ASSUMING FIRST SPONSORSHIP - Mrs. Blackburn asked unanimous consent that she may hereafter be the first sponsor of H.R. 1898, a bill originally introduced by Representative Meehan, for the purpose of adding cosponsors and requesting reprintings pursuant to clause 7 of rule XII. Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 4 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-07-11 - ASSUMING FIRST SPONSORSHIP - Mrs. Blackburn asked unanimous consent that she may hereafter be the first sponsor of H.R. 1898, a bill originally introduced by Representative Meehan, for the purpose of adding cosponsors and requesting reprintings pursuant to clause 7 of rule XII. Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend title XVIII of the Social Security Act to improve access to, and utilization of, bone mass measurement benefits under part B of the Medicare program by establishing a minimum payment amount under such part for bone mass measurement. This bill specifies that certain Medicare payment rules applicable to imaging services shall apply to dual-energy x-ray absorptiometry services used in bone mass scans beginning in 2017. The Centers for Medicare & Medicaid Services must establish national minimum payment amounts for such services.
Title
To amend title XVIII of the Social Security Act to improve access to, and utilization of, bone mass measurement benefits under part B of the Medicare program by establishing a minimum payment amount under such part for bone mass measurement.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-11 | House | ASSUMING FIRST SPONSORSHIP - Mrs. Blackburn asked unanimous consent that she may hereafter be the first sponsor of H.R. 1898, a bill originally introduced by Representative Meehan, for the purpose of adding cosponsors and requesting reprintings pursuant to clause 7 of rule XII. Agreed to without objection. |
2017-04-17 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2017-04-07 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2017-04-04 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-04-04 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-04-04 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-04-04 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB3160 (Related) 2018-06-28 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S4737)
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-bill/1898/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hr1898/BILLS-115hr1898ih.pdf |