US HB1870 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on July 21 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-07-21 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: Senate Homeland Security And Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on July 21 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-07-21 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: Senate Homeland Security And Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To require the Secretary of Homeland Security to prioritize strengthening of local transportation security capabilities by assigning certain officers and intelligence analysts to State, local, and regional fusion centers in jurisdictions with a high-risk surface transportation asset and improving the timely sharing of information regarding threats of terrorism and other threats, including targeted violence, and for other purposes.
Title
Strengthening Local Transportation Security Capabilities Act of 2021
Sponsors
Rep. Nanette Barragan [D-CA] | Rep. Bennie Thompson [D-MS] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-21 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
2021-07-20 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2021-07-20 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H3681-3682) |
2021-07-20 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1870. |
2021-07-20 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H3681-3683) |
2021-07-20 | House | Ms. Barragan moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2021-03-18 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended). |
2021-03-18 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2021-03-18 | House | Subcommittee on Transportation and Maritime Security Discharged. |
2021-03-13 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Transportation and Maritime Security. |
2021-03-12 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Homeland Security. |
2021-03-12 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1605 (Related) 2021-12-27 - Became Public Law No: 117-81.